Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2862 Week
» 21644 Month
» 269937 Year
» 1154318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNWR 2255 m/e 07/1922
LMS 9431 m/e 05/1927
BR 49431 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Beames
Class G2
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
To Service During 07/1922
Withdrawal w/e Sat 01/12/1962
Scrapping Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 40 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
3A Bescot 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2A Rugby 3w/e 11/12/1948
2F Market Harborough 4w/e 05/11/1955
2D Coventry 4w/e 25/01/1958
2B Nuneaton w/e 15/11/1958
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 05/05/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 01/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1922 To Service To service as LNWR Number 2255    
05/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9431    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49431    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Market Harborough (2F)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Coventry (2D)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
05/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
01/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 49431    

prev prev