Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 145 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4386 Week
» 17419 Month
» 239820 Year
» 1124201 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNWR 2371 m/e 07/1922
LMS 9433 m/e 03/1927
BR 49433 m/e 12/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Beames
Class G2
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
To Service During 07/1922
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/10/1961
Service Life 39 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
2A Rugby 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
8C Speke Junction 4w/e 30/11/1957
9D Buxton (LNWR) w/e 15/08/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 07/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1922 To Service To service as LNWR Number 2371    
03/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9433    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A)    
12/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 49433    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
15/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 49433    

prev prev