Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1026 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3125 Week
» 14696 Month
» 262989 Year
» 1147370 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNWR 344 m/e 08/1922
LMS 9434 m/e 11/1927
BR 49434 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Beames
Class G2
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
To Service During 08/1922
Withdrawal w/e Sat 20/10/1962
Scrapping Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 40 yrs, 2 mths , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
2A Rugby 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
11A Carnforth 4w/e 19/05/1951
8A Edge Hill 4w/e 29/12/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 20/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1922 To Service To service as LNWR Number 344    
11/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9434    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49434    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (11A)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
20/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 49434    

prev prev