Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4226 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17632 Week
» 70648 Month
» 190175 Year
» 3217028 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
895 |
m/e |
08/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9436 |
m/e |
12/1926 |
British Railways |
49436 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 08/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/05/1959 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 9 mths , 22 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 895 |
|
|
12/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9436 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49436 |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
23/05/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49436 |
|
|