Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 736 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14142 Week
» 67158 Month
» 186685 Year
» 3213538 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2386 |
m/e |
09/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9444 |
m/e |
08/1927 |
British Railways |
49444 |
m/e |
04/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 09/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/10/1961 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2D |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
ALLOC |
2D |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
06/05/1950 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
ALLOC |
2F |
Market Harborough |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
4w/e |
27/08/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/07/1958 |
Market Harborough MPD |
Now that this LNWR depot is in the Midland Division, all wash-outs are performed at Leicester (15C) instead of Rugby. On 20th July locomotives on shed were-42446(15F), 42673(2A), 44388(15F), 44847(14D), 48290(2E), 48445(2E), 48601(1A) and 49444(15F). 49447 was at Leicester, |
SLS/195808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2386 |
|
|
08/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9444 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Northampton (2C) |
|
|
02/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
06/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
04/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49444 |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Market Harborough (2F) |
|
|
06/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
27/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49444 |
|
|