Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1014 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24645 Week
» 89599 Month
» 292263 Year
» 3319116 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1012 |
m/e |
10/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9446 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
British Railways |
49446 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 10/1922 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 09/04/1964 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 6 mths , 10 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1012 |
|
|
06/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9446 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49446 |
|
|
25/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Market Harborough (2F) |
|
|
25/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
06/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (21C) |
|
|
09/04/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49446 |
|
|