Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 324 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18127 Week
» 71143 Month
» 190670 Year
» 3217523 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2091 |
m/e |
12/1912 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9196 |
m/e |
02/1928 |
British Railways |
49196 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 12/1912 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/10/1961 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1912 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2091 |
|
|
02/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9196 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49196 |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
14/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49196 |
|
|