Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 514 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18317 Week
» 71333 Month
» 190860 Year
» 3217713 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2421 |
m/e |
12/1912 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9200 |
m/e |
09/1927 |
British Railways |
49200 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 12/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/03/1959 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 3 mths , 26 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1912 |
2A |
|
Rugby |
4w/e |
22/06/1946 |
2A |
|
Rugby |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
10B |
|
Preston |
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
8A |
|
Edge Hill |
w/e |
23/09/1950 |
8A |
|
Edge Hill |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/03/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
10B |
Preston |
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
23/09/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
28/03/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1912 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2421 |
|
|
09/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9200 |
|
|
22/06/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49200 |
|
|
10/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
23/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
28/03/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49200 |
|
|