Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3582 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16988 Week
» 70004 Month
» 189531 Year
» 3216384 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
99 |
m/e |
07/1914 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9249 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
British Railways |
49249 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 07/1914 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/12/1959 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1914 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 99 |
|
|
09/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9249 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Watford (1C) |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
19/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49249 |
|
|
07/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
17/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49249 |
|
|