Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1437 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19240 Week
» 72256 Month
» 191783 Year
» 3218636 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1121 |
m/e |
01/1918 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9284 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
British Railways |
49284 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Cooke |
Class |
G1 |
Company History |
LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 01/1918 |
Withdrawal |
During 03/1950 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
6B |
Mold Junction |
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
ALLOC |
5C |
Stafford |
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1918 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1121 |
|
|
02/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9284 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 49284 but not taken up |
|
|
30/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
08/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9284 |
|
|