Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 545 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18348 Week
» 71364 Month
» 190891 Year
» 3217744 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9510 |
on |
06/05/1929 |
British Railways |
49510 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 06/05/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 08/09/1951 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Fri 28/09/1951 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
26B |
Agecroft |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
ALLOC |
26C |
Bolton |
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
ALLOC |
27B |
Aintree |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/09/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/05/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9510 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (26B) |
|
|
04/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49510 |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49510 |
|
|
28/09/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|