Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 565 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19476 Week
» 84430 Month
» 287094 Year
» 3313947 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9515 |
on |
22/05/1929 |
British Railways |
49515 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 22/05/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/11/1959 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
22/05/1929 |
25A |
|
Wakefield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
23B |
|
Aintree |
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
26A |
|
Newton Heath |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/11/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
23B |
Aintree |
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
ALLOC |
26A |
Newton Heath |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/05/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9515 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
24/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (23B) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49515 |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49515 |
|
|
08/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|