Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 780 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14186 Week
» 67202 Month
» 186729 Year
» 3213582 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9543 |
on |
14/08/1929 |
British Railways |
49543 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Tue 14/08/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 08/08/1950 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Fri 25/08/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
14/08/1929 |
25A |
|
Wakefield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
23B |
|
Aintree |
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/08/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
23B |
Aintree |
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/08/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/08/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9543 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (23B) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49543 |
|
|
08/08/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49543 |
|
|
25/08/1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|