Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9592 |
on |
12/12/1929 |
British Railways |
49592 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 12/12/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 16/05/1959 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/12/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9592 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49592 |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (27B) |
|
|
15/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D) |
|
|
10/09/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
28/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
16/05/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49592 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|