Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 840 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18643 Week
» 71659 Month
» 191186 Year
» 3218039 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9613 |
on |
06/03/1931 |
British Railways |
49613 |
on |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Thu 06/03/1931 |
Withdrawal |
During 07/1949 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 3 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
06/03/1931 |
23B |
|
Aintree |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
25A |
|
Wakefield |
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
07/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
23B |
Aintree |
w/e |
13/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
25A |
Wakefield |
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/07/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/05/1946 |
New LMS Districts |
New Districts have been formed as follows (as from 6th May, 1946): Bletchley comprising 2B with 2C (Northampton); leaving Rugby with 2A, 2D, 2E, and 2F. The Depot number 2G for Leighton Buzzard has been discontinued. Blackpool comprising 24E with 24F (Fleetwood) Lostock Hall is now in the Accrington District and the Depot No. is now 24C; leaving Bank Hall with 23A to 23D. The Lostock Hall engines which require altered shedplates are 2200/1, 2434-7, 2556, 9502/3, z 9523/4, 9534/5, 9542/9, 9571/98, 9611-7, 9640/9, 10801/69, 10938/41/3, 11345, 11423, 11526, 12160/71, 12244/96, 12317/34/6/99, 12431/60/7, 12522. |
SLS/194606 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/03/1931 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9613 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B) |
|
|
24/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 49613 but not taken up |
|
|
07/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 9613 |
|
|
02/1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|