Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 857 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18660 Week
» 71676 Month
» 191203 Year
» 3218056 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9649 |
on |
23/02/1932 |
British Railways |
49649 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Wed 23/02/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 29/11/1950 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Fri 22/12/1950 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
23/02/1932 |
24C |
|
Lostock Hall |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
23B |
|
Aintree |
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
29/11/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
23B |
Aintree |
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/12/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/05/1946 |
New LMS Districts |
New Districts have been formed as follows (as from 6th May, 1946): Bletchley comprising 2B with 2C (Northampton); leaving Rugby with 2A, 2D, 2E, and 2F. The Depot number 2G for Leighton Buzzard has been discontinued. Blackpool comprising 24E with 24F (Fleetwood) Lostock Hall is now in the Accrington District and the Depot No. is now 24C; leaving Bank Hall with 23A to 23D. The Lostock Hall engines which require altered shedplates are 2200/1, 2434-7, 2556, 9502/3, z 9523/4, 9534/5, 9542/9, 9571/98, 9611-7, 9640/9, 10801/69, 10938/41/3, 11345, 11423, 11526, 12160/71, 12244/96, 12317/34/6/99, 12431/60/7, 12522. |
SLS/194606 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/02/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9649 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lostock Hall (24C) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49649 |
|
|
21/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (23B) |
|
|
29/11/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49649 |
|
|
22/12/1950 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|