Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3985 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17391 Week
» 70407 Month
» 189934 Year
» 3216787 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9671 |
on |
20/06/1932 |
British Railways |
49671 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 20/06/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 08/03/1952 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 8 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Fri 18/04/1952 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
20/06/1932 |
25A |
|
Wakefield |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
23B |
|
Aintree |
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
08/03/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
23B |
Aintree |
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/03/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/06/1932 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 9671 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
24/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (23B) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49671 |
|
|
08/03/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49671 |
|
|
18/04/1952 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|