Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 289 Today
» 752 Yesterday
» 3528 Week
» 16041 Month
» 104233 Year
» 988614 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4081   03/1924

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/1924 WARWICK CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 03/1924 to Unallocated (n/a)
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/02/1963 off Carmarthen (87G)
Scrapping During 10/1963 at Hayes (Bridgend)
Service Life 38 yrs, 11 mths , 11 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Churchward 3,500g 2229 03/1924 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1978 06/1925 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 2124 06/1925 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 2233 09/1926 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2409 02/03/1929 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1869 19/12/1929 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1874 10/1930 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2562 18/06/1931 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2435 28/10/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2604 05/05/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2722 06/04/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2430 24/12/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2435 03/03/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2388 11/07/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2735 22/12/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2771 18/04/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2398 08/07/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2562 17/03/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2543 23/08/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2537 18/12/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2687 26/06/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2673 19/06/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2827 28/03/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2421 26/11/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2423 29/11/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2784 21/01/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2571 03/12/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2817 19/12/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2669 15/09/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4124 03/09/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2447 28/08/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2679 26/08/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2583 10/05/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2688 28/03/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4116 03/10/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2861 22/01/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2867 18/10/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
n/a Unallocated (New) 03/1924
PDN Old Oak Common 06/04/1924
RDG Reading (W.R.) 05/03/1929
PDN Old Oak Common 15/03/1929
CDF Cardiff Canton 09/01/1931
LA Laira 08/01/1932
EXE Exeter 08/1932
LA Laira 05/11/1932
CDF Cardiff Canton 04/1933
BRD Bristol Bath Road 12/05/1934
Brd Weston-super-Mare 21/04/1940
BRD Bristol Bath Road 05/1940
Brd Weston-super-Mare 03/1941
BRD Bristol Bath Road 12/07/1941
LDR Landore 26/11/1946
SDN Swindon 10/07/1948
87E Landore 04/11/1950
86C Cardiff Canton 20/03/1958
83C Exeter 16/05/1958
82A Bristol Bath Road 02/12/1958
84G Shrewsbury 18/06/1959
82A Bristol Bath Road 15/07/1959
87G Carmarthen 16/09/1960
87F Llanelly 18/10/1961
87G Carmarthen 14/07/1962
   Withdrawn 4w/e 09/02/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LDR Landore 4w/e 28/12/1946
ALLOC SDN Swindon 4w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road m/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 08/08/1959
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 17/06/1961
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 14/07/1962
WDN   4w/e 09/02/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1924 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4609)
10/09/1926 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4604)
25/08/1928 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4622)
04/12/1930 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4602)
05/05/1934 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4604)
06/04/1937 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6609)
08/07/1941 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4621)
19/06/1945 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6674)
26/11/1946 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6675)
03/12/1948 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6625)
15/09/1950 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6600)
03/09/1952 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6654)
26/08/1954 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6655)
10/05/1956 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6637)
28/03/1958 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6608)
22/01/1960 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6636)
18/10/1961 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6674)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 08/05/1925 20/06/1925 44 days Heavy
Tender number 1978 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
80185
Swindon Works 08/01/1926 23/01/1926 16 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 28/06/1926 21/09/1926 86 days Heavy
Boiler number 4604 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2233 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
141549
Swindon Works 03/11/1926 17/12/1926 45 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 25/06/1927 17/08/1927 54 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 18/06/1928 02/09/1928 77 days Heavy
Boiler number 4622 (Diagram HA)
243717
Swindon Works 16/02/1929 05/03/1929 18 days Light Repair
Tender number 2409 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 22/10/1929 26/12/1929 66 days Light Repair
Tender number 1869 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 06/10/1930 18/12/1930 74 days Heavy
Boiler number 4602 (Diagram HA)
384156
Swindon Works 17/11/1931 08/01/1932 53 days Intermediate 439279
Swindon Works 20/09/1932 05/11/1932 47 days Light Repair
Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 11/02/1933 04/1933   Intermediate  
Swindon Works 12/03/1934 12/05/1934 62 days General
Boiler number 4604 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2604 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
575525
Swindon Works 05/06/1935 14/06/1935 10 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 08/10/1935 12/12/1935 66 days Intermediate 670459
Swindon Works 11/02/1936 25/03/1936 44 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 12/02/1937 14/04/1937 62 days General
Boiler number 6609 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2722 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
741408
Swindon Works 22/11/1937 01/05/1938 161 days Light Repair
Tender number 2430 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 23/05/1938 18/07/1938 57 days Intermediate
Tender number 2388 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
823932
Swindon Works 06/11/1939 07/01/1940 63 days Intermediate
Tender number 2735 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
917173
Swindon Works 18/03/1940 21/04/1940 35 days Light Repair
Tender number 2771 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 10/04/1941 12/07/1941 94 days Light Repair
Boiler number 4621 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2398 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
978064
Swindon Works 20/01/1942 26/03/1942 66 days Intermediate
Tender number 2562 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1011304
Swindon Works 28/05/1942 12/06/1942 16 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 05/07/1943 25/08/1943 52 days Intermediate
Tender number 2543 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1085084
Swindon Works 07/05/1945 19/06/1945 44 days General
Boiler number 6674 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2673 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1141933
Swindon Works 15/10/1946 26/11/1946 43 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6675 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2421 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1205641
Swindon Works 09/12/1947 21/01/1948 44 days Light Repair
Tender number 2784 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 29/10/1948 03/12/1948 36 days General
Boiler number 6625 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2571 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1287215
Swindon Works 28/01/1949 01/02/1949 5 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 02/11/1949 19/12/1949 48 days Light Casual
Tender number 2817 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 10/08/1950 15/09/1950 37 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6600 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2669 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1367181
Swindon Works 22/07/1952 03/09/1952 44 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6654 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4124 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1446409
Swindon Works 21/07/1953 28/08/1953 39 days Light Casual
Tender number 2447 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 23/06/1954 26/08/1954 65 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6655 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2679 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1527260
Swindon Works 23/03/1956 10/05/1956 49 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6637 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1598756
Swindon Works 13/01/1958 20/03/1958 67 days Heavy General  
Swindon Works 24/11/1959 27/01/1960 65 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6636 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2861 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1762901
Swindon Works 22/08/1961 18/10/1961 58 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6674 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2867 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1845610

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1924 To Service To service as GWR Number 4081, name: WARWICK CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Unallocated (n/a)
Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g
Diagram HA boiler fitted
   
06/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
08/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/05/1925. Dep: 20/06/1925.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 1978 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
08/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/01/1926. Dep: 23/01/1926.    
28/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/06/1926. Dep: 21/09/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4604 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2233 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
03/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/11/1926. Dep: 17/12/1926.    
25/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/06/1927. Dep: 17/08/1927.    
18/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/06/1928. Dep: 02/09/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4622 (Diagram HA)
   
16/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/02/1929. Dep: 05/03/1929.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2409 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (RDG)    
15/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
22/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/10/1929. Dep: 26/12/1929.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 1869 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
10/1930 Tender Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 1874    
06/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/10/1930. Dep: 18/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4602 (Diagram HA)
   
09/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
18/06/1931 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2562    
17/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/11/1931. Dep: 08/01/1932.    
08/01/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
08/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (EXE)    
20/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1932. Dep: 05/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/11/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
11/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/02/1933. Dep: ?/04/1933.    
04/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
12/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1934. Dep: 12/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4604 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2604 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/05/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
05/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/06/1935. Dep: 14/06/1935.    
08/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/10/1935. Dep: 12/12/1935.    
11/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/02/1936. Dep: 25/03/1936.    
12/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1937. Dep: 14/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6609 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2722 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/11/1937. Dep: 01/05/1938.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2430 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 23/05/1938. Dep: 18/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2388 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 06/11/1939. Dep: 07/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2735 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/03/1940. Dep: 21/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2771 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/04/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Weston-super-Mare (Brd)    
05/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
03/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Weston-super-Mare (Brd)    
10/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/04/1941. Dep: 12/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4621 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2398 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/07/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
20/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 20/01/1942. Dep: 26/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2562 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
28/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/05/1942. Dep: 12/06/1942.    
05/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 05/07/1943. Dep: 25/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2543 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/12/1943 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2537    
26/06/1944 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2687    
07/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1945. Dep: 19/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6674 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2673 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
28/03/1946 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2827    
15/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 15/10/1946. Dep: 26/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6675 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2421 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
26/11/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (LDR)    
29/11/1947 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2423    
09/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/12/1947. Dep: 21/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2784 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
29/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1948. Dep: 03/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6625 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2571 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
28/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/01/1949. Dep: 01/02/1949.    
02/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/11/1949. Dep: 19/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2817 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 10/08/1950. Dep: 15/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6600 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2669 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
22/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 22/07/1952. Dep: 03/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6654 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4124 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
21/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/07/1953. Dep: 28/08/1953.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2447 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 23/06/1954. Dep: 26/08/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6655 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2679 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/03/1956. Dep: 10/05/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6637 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 13/01/1958. Dep: 20/03/1958.    
20/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
28/03/1958 Modification Diagram HB number 6608 boiler fitted    
28/03/1958 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2688    
16/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
02/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
18/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
15/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
03/10/1959 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4116    
24/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/11/1959. Dep: 27/01/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6636 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2861 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
22/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/08/1961. Dep: 18/10/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6674 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2867 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
09/02/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 4081 from Carmarthen (87G)    
10/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Hayes: Bridgend    

prev prev