Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 134 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2119 Week
» 9303 Month
» 317284 Year
» 1201665 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4082   12/04/1924
BR (Renum) 7013   22/02/1952

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/04/1924 WINDSOR CASTLE
22/02/1952 BRISTOL CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Mon 12/04/1924 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal During 09/1964 off Tyseley (2A)
Scrapping During 01/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 40 yrs, 4 mths , 19 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Churchward 3,500g 2125 12/04/1924 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 2057 05/1925 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1833 09/1926 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2432 05/1929 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2545 13/05/1930 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2410 22/08/1931 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2410 22/08/1931 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2449 22/02/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2449 22/02/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2410 24/04/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2410 24/04/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2591 22/10/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2591 22/10/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2432 13/08/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2432 13/08/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2405 04/12/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2384 20/02/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2632 02/03/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2636 27/11/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2856 08/07/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2405 28/01/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2535 23/04/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2821 27/02/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2674 20/08/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2441 05/05/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2895 18/10/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2405 11/04/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2411 03/07/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2795 03/01/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2755 17/04/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2558 08/10/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2639 08/02/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2583 31/08/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4049 09/11/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2736 14/06/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4043 24/01/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2876 21/02/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2400 11/03/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4088 05/01/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2835 16/03/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2725 19/12/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2693 06/10/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2808 18/04/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 4013 29/05/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2592 26/12/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2781 09/02/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2687 04/11/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2926 22/12/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 12/04/1924
NA Newton Abbot 25/05/1928
LA Laira 13/05/1929
PDN Old Oak Common 23/08/1931
SRD Stafford Road 16/12/1932
PDN Old Oak Common 22/02/1933
BRD Bristol Bath Road 25/08/1935
PDN Old Oak Common 13/03/1938
85 Gloucester Horton Road m/e 02/1941
SDN Swindon 08/10/1946
85 Gloucester Horton Road 08/02/1947
STJ Severn Tunnel Junction 13/01/1948
85 Gloucester Horton Road 09/03/1948
WOS Worcester m/e 02/1949
82C Swindon 08/02/1952
81A Old Oak Common 05/01/1954
   Stored (Old Oak Common) 22/10/1962
81A Old Oak Common (Reinstated) 13/04/1964
2A Tyseley 20/06/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WOS Worcester 4w/e 26/02/1949
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 88A Cardiff East Dock 5w/e 30/03/1964
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 2w/e 13/04/1964
WDN   w/e 06/02/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/04/1924 Diagram HA boiler fitted
12/04/1927 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4606)
04/05/1928 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4620)
13/05/1930 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4626)
09/12/1932 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4645)
13/08/1935 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4606)
02/03/1938 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4627)
27/02/1943 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4638)
08/02/1947 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6611)
31/08/1948 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6602)
14/06/1949 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4606)
21/02/1951 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6654)
05/01/1954 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 6693)
19/12/1955 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7625)
29/05/1958 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7608)
29/05/1958 Double Chimney fitted
09/02/1960 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6637)
22/12/1961 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7640)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 18/04/1925 22/06/1925 66 days Heavy
Tender number 2057 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
68677
Swindon Works 18/09/1926 27/09/1926 10 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 28/10/1926 02/11/1926 6 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 21/02/1927 14/04/1927 53 days Heavy
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
170041
Swindon Works 25/06/1927 12/07/1927 18 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 03/02/1928 1 day Heavy  
Swindon Works 11/05/1928 25/05/1928 15 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 09/03/1929 13/05/1929 66 days Light Repair
Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 18/03/1930 20/05/1930 64 days Heavy
Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2545 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
342352
Swindon Works 14/07/1930 31/07/1930 18 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 11/06/1931 23/08/1931 74 days Intermediate
Tender number 2410 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
408355
Swindon Works 19/10/1932 16/12/1932 59 days General
Boiler number 4645 (Diagram HA)
474831
Swindon Works 08/02/1934 15/04/1934 67 days Intermediate 549984
Swindon Works 11/10/1934 28/10/1934 18 days Light Repair
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 28/05/1935 25/08/1935 90 days General
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
619743
Swindon Works 31/10/1935 30/11/1935 31 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 23/01/1936 11/02/1936 20 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 05/05/1936 11/07/1936 68 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 18/11/1936 05/12/1936 18 days Light Repair
Tender number 2405 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 31/12/1936 24/02/1937 56 days Intermediate
Tender number 2384 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
708695
Swindon Works 19/04/1937 10/05/1937 22 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 08/06/1937 06/07/1937 29 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 11/11/1937 24/11/1937 14 days Special
Preparation for Royal Coronation train
 
Swindon Works 15/01/1938 13/03/1938 58 days General
Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2632 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
774914
Swindon Works 19/05/1938 11/06/1938 24 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 19/09/1938 27/10/1938 39 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 17/04/1939 19/06/1939 64 days Intermediate 848847
Swindon Works 08/10/1940 04/12/1940 58 days Intermediate
Tender number 2636 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
930992
Swindon Works 26/05/1941 08/07/1941 44 days Light Repair
Tender number 2856 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 11/12/1941 01/02/1942 53 days Light Repair
Tender number 2405 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 15/05/1942 13/06/1942 30 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 18/01/1943 03/03/1943 45 days General
Boiler number 4638 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2821 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1018313
Swindon Works 03/07/1943 20/08/1943 49 days Light Repair
Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 27/03/1944 10/05/1944 45 days Light Repair
Tender number 2441 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 05/09/1944 18/10/1944 44 days Intermediate
Tender number 2895 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1079784
Swindon Works 29/05/1945 03/07/1945 36 days Light Repair
Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 12/11/1945 03/01/1946 53 days Light Repair
Tender number 2795 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 14/03/1946 17/04/1946 35 days Light Repair
Tender number 2755 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 04/09/1946 08/10/1946 35 days Light Repair
Tender number 2558 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 04/01/1947 08/02/1947 36 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6611 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2639 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1137520
Swindon Works 22/08/1947 28/08/1947 7 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 29/07/1948 31/08/1948 34 days Light Repair
Boiler number 6602 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1198742
Swindon Works 11/05/1949 14/06/1949 35 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2736 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1230009
Swindon Works 23/01/1951 26/02/1951 35 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6654 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2876 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1300024
Swindon Works 14/03/1952 1 day Heavy General  
Swindon Works 19/11/1953 05/01/1954 48 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6693 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4088 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
293522
Swindon Works 19/01/1955 16/03/1955 57 days Light Casual
Tender number 2835 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 14/11/1955 19/12/1955 36 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7625 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2725 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
397374
Swindon Works 10/11/1956 18/04/1957 160 days Heavy Casual
Tender number 2808 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 28/03/1958 29/05/1958 63 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7608 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4013 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
499654
Swindon Works 09/12/1959 09/02/1960 63 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6637 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2592 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
592862
Swindon Works 28/10/1961 22/12/1961 56 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7640 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2687 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
671419

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/04/1924 To Service To service as GWR Number 4082, name: WINDSOR CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g
Diagram HA boiler fitted
   
18/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/04/1925. Dep: 22/06/1925.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2057 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
09/1926 Tender Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 1833    
18/09/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/09/1926. Dep: 27/09/1926.    
28/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/10/1926. Dep: 02/11/1926.    
21/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/02/1927. Dep: 14/04/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
   
25/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/06/1927. Dep: 12/07/1927.    
03/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/02/1928.    
04/05/1928 Modification Diagram HA number 4620 boiler fitted    
11/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/05/1928. Dep: 25/05/1928.    
25/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
09/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/03/1929. Dep: 13/05/1929.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
18/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/03/1930. Dep: 20/05/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2545 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
14/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/07/1930. Dep: 31/07/1930.    
11/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/06/1931. Dep: 23/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2410 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/08/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
19/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1932. Dep: 16/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4645 (Diagram HA)
   
16/12/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD)    
22/02/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
22/02/1933 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2449    
22/02/1933 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2449    
24/04/1933 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2410    
24/04/1933 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2410    
08/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/02/1934. Dep: 15/04/1934.    
11/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/10/1934. Dep: 28/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
28/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1935. Dep: 25/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
25/08/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
31/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/10/1935. Dep: 30/11/1935.    
23/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/01/1936. Dep: 11/02/1936.    
05/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/05/1936. Dep: 11/07/1936.    
18/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/11/1936. Dep: 05/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2405 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
31/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 31/12/1936. Dep: 24/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2384 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
19/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/04/1937. Dep: 10/05/1937.    
08/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/06/1937. Dep: 06/07/1937.    
11/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Special) - Arr: 11/11/1937. Dep: 24/11/1937.
Work undertaken:
Preparation for Royal Coronation train
   
15/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1938. Dep: 13/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2632 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/03/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
19/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/05/1938. Dep: 11/06/1938.    
19/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/09/1938. Dep: 27/10/1938.    
17/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/04/1939. Dep: 19/06/1939.    
08/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/10/1940. Dep: 04/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2636 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85)    
26/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/05/1941. Dep: 08/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2856 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/12/1941. Dep: 01/02/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2405 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/04/1942 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2535    
15/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/05/1942. Dep: 13/06/1942.    
18/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1943. Dep: 03/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4638 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2821 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/07/1943. Dep: 20/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/03/1944. Dep: 10/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2441 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 05/09/1944. Dep: 18/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2895 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/04/1945 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2405    
29/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/05/1945. Dep: 03/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/11/1945. Dep: 03/01/1946.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2795 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
14/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/03/1946. Dep: 17/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2755 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/09/1946. Dep: 08/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2558 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
04/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 04/01/1947. Dep: 08/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6611 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2639 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/02/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85)    
22/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/08/1947. Dep: 28/08/1947.    
13/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (STJ)    
09/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85)    
29/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/07/1948. Dep: 31/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6602 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
09/11/1948 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4049    
02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (WOS)    
11/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 11/05/1949. Dep: 14/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2736 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/01/1950 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4043    
23/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/01/1951. Dep: 26/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6654 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2876 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
22/02/1952 Naming Renamed 'BRISTOL CASTLE'    
22/02/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 7013    
11/03/1952 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2400    
14/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 14/03/1952.    
19/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/11/1953. Dep: 05/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6693 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4088 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
05/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
19/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/01/1955. Dep: 16/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2835 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
14/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 14/11/1955. Dep: 19/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7625 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2725 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/10/1956 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2693    
10/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/11/1956. Dep: 18/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2808 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
28/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/03/1958. Dep: 29/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7608 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4013 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
   
09/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/12/1959. Dep: 09/02/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6637 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2592 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
28/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/10/1961. Dep: 22/12/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7640 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2687 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
22/10/1962 To Store To Store at Old Oak Common (81A)    
13/04/1964 Reinstated Reinstated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 7013 from Tyseley (2A)    
01/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev