Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 289 Today
» 752 Yesterday
» 3528 Week
» 16041 Month
» 104233 Year
» 988614 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4083   09/05/1925

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/05/1925 ABBOTSBURY CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Tue 09/05/1925 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Tue 19/12/1961 off Cardiff Canton (88A)
Scrapping During 01/1962 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 36 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Churchward 3,500g 2045 05/1925 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Dean 4,000g 1513 01/06/1926 GWR 4,000g
Churchward 3,500g 1699 17/05/1927 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2443 09/09/1929 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2539 22/01/1931 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2421 27/05/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 3,500g 2266 14/07/1933 GWR 3,500g 5t 10cwt
Collett 4,000g 2423 12/10/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2653 28/12/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2543 04/02/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2726 09/06/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2750 30/07/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2575 10/08/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2752 14/02/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2647 25/02/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2410 06/09/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2697 08/11/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2634 06/01/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2426 06/05/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2857 21/10/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2576 30/03/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2543 04/09/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2632 22/12/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2909 24/03/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2675 11/09/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2826 15/03/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2807 07/05/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4002 26/10/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4000 13/11/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2670 16/01/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2639 19/08/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2868 02/08/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4034 10/11/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2421 29/08/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2548 22/02/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2764 12/07/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2736 04/03/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4107 06/11/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2728 02/02/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4038 29/03/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2884 17/04/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4071 21/10/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 09/05/1925
CDF Cardiff Canton 05/06/1932
PDN Old Oak Common 07/1933
LA Laira 28/12/1934
CDF Cardiff Canton 08/02/1936
   Stored (Cardiff Canton) 06/09/1941
CDF Cardiff Canton (Reinstated) 09/09/1941
   Stored (Cardiff Canton) 21/02/1950
84G Shrewsbury (Reinstated) 15/07/1950
84A Stafford Road 16/11/1950
83A Newton Abbot 24/03/1958
83C Exeter 13/09/1960
88A Cardiff Canton 13/09/1961
   Withdrawn 19/12/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 09/09/1950
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road w/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   m/e 31/12/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/05/1925 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4613)
17/05/1927 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4609)
09/09/1929 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4634)
22/01/1931 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4620)
27/05/1932 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4659)
04/02/1936 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4609)
06/05/1942 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6652)
26/10/1946 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6682)
02/08/1949 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6673)
04/03/1953 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6606)
17/04/1957 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6618)
09/10/1959 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6658)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 22/04/1926 08/06/1926 48 days Light Repair
Tender number 1513 (Dean 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 14/03/1927 21/05/1927 69 days Heavy
Boiler number 4609 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 1699 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
119976
Swindon Works 09/06/1928 23/06/1928 15 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 11/07/1928 01/09/1928 53 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 27/06/1929 17/09/1929 83 days Heavy
Boiler number 4634 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2443 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
256819
Swindon Works 20/11/1930 24/01/1931 66 days General
Boiler number 4620 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2539 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
350728
Swindon Works 08/04/1932 05/06/1932 59 days General
Boiler number 4659 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2421 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
434664
Swindon Works 04/04/1933 30/04/1933 27 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 08/05/1933 07/1933   Intermediate  
Swindon Works 14/02/1934 29/03/1934 44 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 10/10/1934 28/12/1934 80 days Intermediate
Tender number 2653 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
591769
Swindon Works 28/11/1935 08/02/1936 73 days General
Boiler number 4609 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2543 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
661478
Swindon Works 17/02/1937 23/02/1937 7 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 21/04/1937 16/06/1937 57 days Intermediate
Tender number 2726 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
737804
Swindon Works 04/07/1938 06/08/1938 34 days Light Repair
Tender number 2750 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 04/10/1938 28/10/1938 25 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 07/06/1939 13/08/1939 68 days Intermediate
Tender number 2575 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
842461
Swindon Works 30/01/1940 27/02/1940 29 days Light Repair
Tender number 2752 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 09/12/1940 26/02/1941 80 days Light Repair
Tender number 2647 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 18/03/1941 22/04/1941 36 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 19/03/1942 11/05/1942 54 days General
Boiler number 6652 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2426 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
934625
Swindon Works 10/09/1943 25/10/1943 46 days Light Repair
Tender number 2857 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 23/02/1944 07/04/1944 45 days Light Repair
Tender number 2576 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 07/11/1944 22/12/1944 46 days Intermediate
Tender number 2632 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1035269
Swindon Works 28/02/1945 24/03/1945 25 days Light Repair
Tender number 2909 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 18/04/1945 30/05/1945 43 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 13/02/1946 15/03/1946 31 days Light Repair
Tender number 2826 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 12/09/1946 26/10/1946 45 days General
Boiler number 6682 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4002 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1101626
Swindon Works 05/07/1947 20/08/1947 47 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 25/06/1948 19/08/1948 56 days Light Repair
Tender number 2639 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 10/11/1948 25/11/1948 16 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 13/06/1949 02/08/1949 51 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6673 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2868 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1208479
Swindon Works 11/10/1949 10/11/1949 31 days Light Casual
Tender number 4034 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 04/07/1951 29/08/1951 57 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2421 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1275636
Swindon Works 17/01/1952 22/02/1952 37 days Light Casual
Tender number 2548 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 26/01/1953 04/03/1953 38 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6606 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2736 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1336829
Swindon Works 23/09/1953 06/11/1953 45 days Light Casual
Tender number 4107 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 01/01/1954 02/02/1954 33 days Light Casual
Tender number 2728 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 12/01/1955 29/03/1955 77 days Unclassified
Tender number 4038 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1406538
Swindon Works 27/02/1957 17/04/1957 50 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6618 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2884 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1497593
Swindon Works 30/07/1959 09/10/1959 72 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6658 (Diagram HB)
1594780

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1925 Tender Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 2045    
09/05/1925 To Service To service as GWR Number 4083, name: ABBOTSBURY CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HA boiler fitted
   
22/04/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/04/1926. Dep: 08/06/1926.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 1513 (Dean 4,000g) attached.
   
14/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/03/1927. Dep: 21/05/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4609 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 1699 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
09/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/06/1928. Dep: 23/06/1928.    
11/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/07/1928. Dep: 01/09/1928.    
27/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 27/06/1929. Dep: 17/09/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4634 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2443 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1930. Dep: 24/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4620 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2539 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1932. Dep: 05/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4659 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2421 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/06/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
04/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/04/1933. Dep: 30/04/1933.    
08/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/05/1933. Dep: ?/07/1933.    
07/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
14/07/1933 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 3,500g number 2266    
12/10/1933 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2423    
14/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/02/1934. Dep: 29/03/1934.    
10/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 10/10/1934. Dep: 28/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2653 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
28/12/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
28/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1935. Dep: 08/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4609 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2543 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/02/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
17/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/02/1937. Dep: 23/02/1937.    
21/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 21/04/1937. Dep: 16/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2726 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/07/1938. Dep: 06/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2750 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/10/1938. Dep: 28/10/1938.    
07/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/06/1939. Dep: 13/08/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2575 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
30/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/01/1940. Dep: 27/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2752 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
09/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/12/1940. Dep: 26/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2647 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/03/1941. Dep: 22/04/1941.    
06/09/1941 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2410    
06/09/1941 To Store To Store at Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
09/09/1941 Reinstated Reinstated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
08/11/1941 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2697    
06/01/1942 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2634    
19/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1942. Dep: 11/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6652 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2426 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/09/1943. Dep: 25/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2857 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1944. Dep: 07/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2576 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/09/1944 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2543    
07/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/11/1944. Dep: 22/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2632 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
28/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/02/1945. Dep: 24/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2909 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/04/1945. Dep: 30/05/1945.    
11/09/1945 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2675    
13/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/02/1946. Dep: 15/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2826 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/05/1946 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2807    
12/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6682 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4002 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
13/11/1946 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4000    
05/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/07/1947. Dep: 20/08/1947.    
16/01/1948 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2670    
25/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/06/1948. Dep: 19/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2639 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/11/1948. Dep: 25/11/1948.    
13/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 13/06/1949. Dep: 02/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6673 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2868 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1949. Dep: 10/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4034 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
21/02/1950 To Store To Store at Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
15/07/1950 Reinstated Reinstated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
16/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
04/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/07/1951. Dep: 29/08/1951.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2421 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/01/1952. Dep: 22/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2548 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/07/1952 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2764    
26/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 26/01/1953. Dep: 04/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6606 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2736 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/09/1953. Dep: 06/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4107 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
01/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/01/1954. Dep: 02/02/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2728 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/01/1955. Dep: 29/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4038 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
27/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/02/1957. Dep: 17/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6618 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2884 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
21/10/1958 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4071    
30/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/07/1959. Dep: 09/10/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6658 (Diagram HB)
   
13/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
13/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. SLS 1/1962 Link
19/12/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 4083 from Cardiff Canton (88A)    
01/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev