Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1490 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19293 Week
» 72309 Month
» 191836 Year
» 3218689 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
782 |
m/e |
02/1923 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
7931 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
British Railways |
47931 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
7F |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-4T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5723 |
To Service |
During 02/1923 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 15/12/1951 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1952 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
15/12/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/10/1945 |
Swansea Paxton Street MPD |
Home engines on shed on 17/10 were: 1676, 2360/81/90, 7715/41, 7807, 7931/3/41, 8325/44/5, 8673/89/91, 9033, 9260, 9358, 27621, 28543, 28622. Other locos were 2307, 5245, 5318, 8324, 8688, 9019 of 4A and 7258 of 4C. |
SLS/194601 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1923 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 782 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 5723 |
|
|
12/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7931 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47931 |
|
|
15/12/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47931 |
|
|
01/1952 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|