Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3044 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16450 Week
» 69466 Month
» 188993 Year
» 3215846 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4085 |
08/02/1962 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/02/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
08/02/1962 |
Power Unit 61E292 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/02/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4085 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
02/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
31/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J) |
|
|
30/06/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4085 |
|
|
01/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|