Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 910 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4509 Week
» 10643 Month
» 238527 Year
» 1460092 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4087 on 27/06/1925

Names Carried
Date From Name
27/06/1925 CARDIGAN CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 232
To Service Mon 27/06/1925 to Laira (LA)
Withdrawal Mon 07/10/1963 off Laira (84A)
Scrapping During 05/1964 at Coopers Metals (Sharpness)
Service Life 38 yrs, 3 mths , 10 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Churchward 3,500g 2035 06/1925 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1728 09/1927 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1884 06/1928 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2430 22/06/1929 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1682 20/12/1929 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2565 13/08/1931 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2438 29/01/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2445 21/07/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2577 12/07/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2406 24/06/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2598 12/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2773 26/01/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2685 25/12/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2755 13/01/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2530 02/12/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2445 17/01/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2673 23/02/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2604 18/05/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 2256 15/06/1946 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2739 02/11/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2413 11/02/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2620 10/11/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2566 22/12/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2553 23/04/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2569 24/05/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2565 02/12/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4055 31/03/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2712 06/11/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2767 23/04/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4050 30/04/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4074 04/03/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4101 18/08/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2865 05/07/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2696 02/11/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2881 05/02/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2696 13/08/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4102 10/10/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LA Laira (New) 27/06/1925
NA Newton Abbot 16/04/1927
LA Laira 24/05/1927
NA Newton Abbot m/e 08/1928
LA Laira 18/08/1931
CDF Cardiff Canton 29/07/1932
PDN Old Oak Common m/e 07/1933
EXE Exeter 21/02/1936
SRD Stafford Road 07/05/1937
TR Truro 08/07/1937
PZ Penzance 15/10/1937
NA Newton Abbot 04/02/1939
TR Truro 28/06/1939
LA Laira 03/01/1941
PZ Penzance m/e 12/1949
83D Laira 23/04/1952
83G Penzance m/e 10/1952
83D Laira m/e 08/1954
   Stored (Laira) 13/08/1962
82B St Philips Marsh (Reinstated) 06/04/1963
   Stored (St Philips Marsh) 09/09/1963
   Withdrawn 07/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PZ Penzance 4w/e 28/01/1950
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 20/05/1950
ALLOC 83G Penzance 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 14/08/1954
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 06/04/1963
TOSTORE   4w/e 29/09/1963
WDN   03/10/1963
WDN   5w/e 02/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
27/06/1925 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4617)
22/06/1929 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4605)
12/07/1933 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4646)
13/02/1936 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4620)
26/01/1939 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4653)
17/01/1945 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4613)
11/02/1948 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4602)
31/03/1950 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6635)
06/11/1951 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6679)
30/04/1953 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6648)
04/03/1955 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6629)
05/07/1956 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7665)
05/02/1958 Double Chimney fitted
13/08/1959 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7687)
10/10/1961 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7645)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during January included: Nos. 198, 250, 1009, 1531, 2793, 2859/80/99, 2929/51, 3011/12/44, 3800/07/09/14, 4076/83/87, 4375, 4408, 4542/61,.4854, 4917/87, 5000/01/19/22/30/33/35/48/65/69/75/91/99, 5928/39/46/58/77/94, 6000/03/17/22, 6357/80, 6821/23/62/74, 6906/32, 7001/07, 7308, 9083, W.D. 77005/58/64, 78543/714/717, 79226/34 an 79303. Engines condemned during the same period included Nos. 242, 504, an 3585. Works pilots recently have been: Nos. 198, 905, 1713, an 1781, while 3561 has been on the carriage side. New work: Nos. 6981 , 6982 and 6983 were completed on 20/1, 26/1, and 3/2 respectively; the construction of the 0-6-0 Diesel-electric shunters (Lot 364) is now under way, and the engine of the first one has been mounted on the frames. The first engine to be lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to bear the prefix 'W' in yellow paint, under the numberplate was No. 4946 , which was ex Works on 8/1 (right-hand side only) and later emerged with both sides done on 16/1. Additional locomotives leaving the Works have been dealt with in various styles, as follows: Nos. 4100, 4217, an 5514 with 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and prefixed with a yellow 'W' (Subsequently to 26/1, all prefixes have been in white paint). Nos. 1017, 4062, 4084, 4087, an 4951 were lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and prefixed 'W'; 2880, 5388, 5529, an 6736 with plain tenders and tanks and prefixed with a 'W,' while 2830 carried 'G.W.R.' on the tender and prefixed 'W.' On 23/1 No. 7007 had the old nameplates removed and was renamed Great Western, and on 30/1 No. 7001 emerged from the Works renamed Sir James Milne, with the tender bearing 'G.W.R.' and crest; the number had not been prefixed. All W.D.'s now entering the Works have had the Westinghouse pump removed, presumably at the running sheds SLS/194803
31/12/1948 Swindon Works New Work December: Nos. 6766 NEA (8/12), 6767 (21/12), 6768 (23/12); 6993 Arthog Hall WEY (4/12), 6994 Baggrave Hall EXE (9/12), 6995 Benthall Hall TN (17/12). Nos. 6993-95 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 6766-68 are black and unlined. Locomotives entering Works 29/11/48 to 24/12/48: These included Nos. 62 (condemned), 71 (condemned), 301 (condemned)-re-numbered from 201, 1020/21/22/24, 1400/07/44, 2068, 2414, 2833/37/94, 3430/31 (both condemned), 3614/74/82, 3724, 3808/17/21/38/59/64, 4038/39/80/90, 4087, 4112/50, 4274, 4353 (condemned), 4506/14/63/70/87, 4700, 4920/91, 5002/34/41/45/47/70/87, 5022, 5103, 5351/59/97, 5412/22, 5522/32, 5708/12, 5913/19/56/59/95, 6010/12/23, 6100/48/54, 6323/24/39/85, 6423, 6856, 6930/39/66, 7200/20/22, 7401, 7727, 9306, 9601/06. (4150 and 5022 were the locomotives that were involved in the Lapworth accident). On 16/12 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 2906, 3012/15/17/18/23/41/44, 3453, 4017, 4168/69, 4914, 5153/83. Additional locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 5926 an 6947. 'Austerity' No. 77380 has been fitted with a smokebox numberplate (the first 'Austerity' to be so fitted here). 'Austerity' 2-8-0's to be fitted with standard G.W.R. fittings, which include Wakefield lubricator, G.W. type stuffing box and fountain, whistles, injectors, top feed and fire iron compartment, were ex Swindon Works as follows:-Nos. 77000 (19/5/48). 77027 (24/3/48), 77165 (13/4/48), 77291 (10/12/47), 77429 (9/6/48), 78542 (12/11/47), 79226 (6/9/48), 79278 (28/11/47). Frames are being cut for Lot 373. which, it is understood, is for some 0-6-0PT's with outside Walschaerts valve gear. SLS/194902
17/09/1961 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) 'A' Shop: D604, D816/7/21/3/5/43/70, D3431, D6306/8/21, 2866, 3852, 4003/79/81/7/9, D1000-11, D2379-83, 4117, 4707, 4904/26/33/43/66/79/92/8, 5018/38/74/92, 5208, 5380, 6021/6, 6808/16/25/32/4/40, 6948, 7018/28, 7219, 7825, 7905/21, 13115/84/6, 13259/65, 92215/26. Works Sidings: D820, D2086, D2143/4, D2378, D7000, 1009, 3670, 3839/59, 4100, 4917/8/83, 5000/78, 5951/98, 6014/6/9/27, 6964/87/96, 7200, 7756/75, 7909, 8721, 9400, 9749, 73027, 78008, 92241/5. Triangle: 1640, 5087, 5198, 5516, 5934/75, 8762/72/87, 9751, 13355. Dump: 1361/6, 1433, 1604, 5318, 6720, 7745/98, 8429, 8740/74/7/89, 9735/6/67. 'C' Shop: 4203, 5110/95. Outside Stock Shed: D806, D4025, D6303, 4948, 5815, 6900. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: D801. Gasworks : Nil. SLS/196111

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 21/02/1927 16/04/1927 55 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 13/05/1927 24/05/1927 12 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 09/08/1927 31/08/1927 23 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 21/05/1928 03/07/1928 44 days Light Repair
Tender number 1884 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 25/04/1929 04/07/1929 71 days Heavy
Boiler number 4605 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2430 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
201250
Swindon Works 11/11/1929 24/12/1929 44 days Light Repair
Tender number 1682 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 28/05/1931 18/08/1931 83 days Intermediate
Tender number 2565 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
301986
Swindon Works 12/01/1932 02/02/1932 22 days Light Repair
Tender number 2438 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 25/05/1932 29/07/1932 66 days Intermediate
Tender number 2445 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
343599
Swindon Works 15/05/1933 07/1933   General  
Swindon Works 20/06/1934 25/07/1934 36 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 02/10/1934 03/12/1934 63 days Intermediate 487173
Swindon Works 30/12/1935 21/02/1936 54 days General
Boiler number 4620 (Diagram HA)
575545
Swindon Works 04/11/1936 18/11/1936 15 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 18/05/1937 08/07/1937 52 days Intermediate 651850
Swindon Works 12/12/1938 04/02/1939 55 days General
Boiler number 4653 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2773 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
722265
Swindon Works 24/10/1940 03/01/1941 72 days Intermediate
Tender number 2685 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
805064
Swindon Works 30/11/1942 12/05/1943 164 days Intermediate
Tender number 2755 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
906656
Swindon Works 23/11/1944 17/01/1945 56 days General
Boiler number 4613 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2445 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
993073
Swindon Works 02/01/1948 11/02/1948 41 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4602 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2413 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1100065
Swindon Works 08/12/1948 22/12/1948 15 days Light Repair
Tender number 2566 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 22/04/1949 24/05/1949 33 days Light Casual
Tender number 2553 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 08/02/1950 31/03/1950 52 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6635 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4055 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1189991
Swindon Works 25/09/1951 06/11/1951 43 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6679 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2712 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1267010
Swindon Works 24/03/1952 23/04/1952 31 days Light Casual
Tender number 2767 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 27/02/1953 30/04/1953 63 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6648 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4050 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1347591
Swindon Works 26/01/1955 04/03/1955 38 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6629 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4074 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1433397
Swindon Works 19/07/1955 18/08/1955 31 days Light Casual
Tender number 4101 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 20/02/1956 05/07/1956 137 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7665 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2865 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1486826
Swindon Works 01/01/1958 05/02/1958 36 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2881 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
1588408
Swindon Works 10/06/1959 13/08/1959 65 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7687 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2696 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1672645
Swindon Works 19/08/1961 10/10/1961 53 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7645 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4102 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1766046

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1925 Tender Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 2035    
27/06/1925 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4087, name: CARDIGAN CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (LA)
Diagram HA boiler fitted
   
21/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/02/1927. Dep: 16/04/1927.    
16/04/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
13/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/05/1927. Dep: 24/05/1927.    
24/05/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
09/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/08/1927. Dep: 31/08/1927.    
09/1927 Tender Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 1728    
21/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/05/1928. Dep: 03/07/1928.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 1884 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
08/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
25/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/04/1929. Dep: 04/07/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4605 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2430 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/11/1929. Dep: 24/12/1929.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 1682 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
28/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 28/05/1931. Dep: 18/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2565 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/08/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
12/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/01/1932. Dep: 02/02/1932.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2438 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
25/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 25/05/1932. Dep: 29/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2445 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
29/07/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
15/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1933. Dep: 00/07/1933.    
07/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
12/07/1933 Modification Diagram HA number 4646 boiler fitted    
12/07/1933 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2577    
20/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/06/1934. Dep: 25/07/1934.    
02/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 02/10/1934. Dep: 03/12/1934.    
24/06/1935 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2406    
12/1935 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2598    
30/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1935. Dep: 21/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4620 (Diagram HA)
   
21/02/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (EXE)    
04/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/11/1936. Dep: 18/11/1936.    
07/05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD)    
18/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 18/05/1937. Dep: 08/07/1937.    
08/07/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Truro (TR)    
15/10/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (PZ)    
12/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1938. Dep: 04/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4653 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2773 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/02/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
28/06/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Truro (TR)    
24/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 24/10/1940. Dep: 03/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2685 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/01/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
30/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 30/11/1942. Dep: 12/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2755 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1944. Dep: 17/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4613 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2445 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/02/1946 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2673    
18/05/1946 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2604    
15/06/1946 Tender Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 2256    
02/11/1946 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2739    
02/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 02/01/1948. Dep: 11/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4602 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2413 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/11/1948 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2620    
08/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/12/1948. Dep: 22/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2566 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/04/1949. Dep: 24/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2553 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (PZ)    
02/12/1949 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2565    
08/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/02/1950. Dep: 31/03/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6635 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4055 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
25/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 25/09/1951. Dep: 06/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6679 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2712 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/03/1952. Dep: 23/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2767 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (83G)    
27/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/02/1953. Dep: 30/04/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6648 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4050 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
26/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 26/01/1955. Dep: 04/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6629 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4074 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
19/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/07/1955. Dep: 18/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4101 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
20/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 20/02/1956. Dep: 05/07/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7665 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2865 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/11/1957 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2696    
01/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/01/1958. Dep: 05/02/1958.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2881 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
   
10/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 10/06/1959. Dep: 13/08/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7687 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2696 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
19/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 19/08/1961. Dep: 10/10/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7645 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4102 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
13/08/1962 To Store To Store at Laira (83D)    
06/04/1963 Reinstated Reinstated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
09/09/1963 To Store To Store at St Philips Marsh (82B)    
07/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 4087 from Laira (84A)    

prev prev