|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 23/02/1926 | 27/04/1926 | 64 days | Light Repair | Tender number 1785 (Churchward 3,500g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 16/02/1928 | 15/06/1928 | 121 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4613 (Diagram HA) |
150402 | |
Swindon Works | 05/06/1929 | 17/09/1929 | 105 days | Heavy | Tender number 2436 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
238141 | |
Swindon Works | 05/02/1931 | 02/04/1931 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 4621 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2449 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
333667 | |
Swindon Works | 10/10/1931 | 10/12/1931 | 62 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 26/10/1932 | 20/12/1932 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 4656 (Diagram HA) |
434837 | |
Swindon Works | 31/01/1934 | 28/03/1934 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 4610 (Diagram HA) |
519359 | |
Swindon Works | 30/04/1935 | 11/08/1935 | 104 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
601145 | |
Swindon Works | 17/03/1936 | 05/04/1936 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 09/09/1936 | 22/10/1936 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 4614 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2672 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
685007 | |
Swindon Works | 14/01/1937 | 17/02/1937 | 35 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2420 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 23/12/1937 | 09/02/1938 | 49 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2735 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
760127 | |
Swindon Works | 13/01/1939 | 01/02/1939 | 20 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2605 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 22/05/1939 | 08/07/1939 | 48 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2681 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
830774 | |
Swindon Works | 09/07/1940 | 24/08/1940 | 47 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2626 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 07/07/1941 | 18/09/1941 | 74 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2534 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
914260 | |
Swindon Works | 06/11/1942 | 02/1943 | General | Boiler number 4610 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2659 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
967181 | ||
Swindon Works | 28/06/1943 | 14/08/1943 | 48 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2851 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 07/03/1945 | 19/04/1945 | 44 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2575 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1066052 | |
Swindon Works | 08/09/1945 | 22/10/1945 | 45 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2717 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 06/08/1946 | 07/09/1946 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 6687 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2577 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1128600 | |
Swindon Works | 10/12/1947 | 23/12/1947 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 20/04/1948 | 04/06/1948 | 46 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6607 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2880 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1193136 | |
Swindon Works | 08/09/1949 | 17/10/1949 | 40 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6636 (Diagram HB) |
1259408 | |
Swindon Works | 09/10/1950 | 15/11/1950 | 38 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2645 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 06/06/1951 | 20/07/1951 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6610 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2873 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1349550 | |
Swindon Works | 19/11/1951 | 18/01/1952 | 61 days | Light Casual | Tender number 4108 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 05/03/1953 | 01/05/1953 | 58 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6608 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2886 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1438288 | |
Swindon Works | 16/07/1953 | 04/08/1953 | 20 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2428 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 02/11/1954 | 24/12/1954 | 53 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6685 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4122 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1525213 | |
Swindon Works | 23/02/1956 | 05/04/1956 | 43 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6640 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2851 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1589370 | |
Swindon Works | 14/09/1957 | 18/02/1958 | 158 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7613 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2929 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1669190 | |
Swindon Works | 12/10/1959 | 27/11/1959 | 47 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6699 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4095 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1759100 | |
Swindon Works | 08/08/1961 | 05/10/1961 | 59 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6697 (Diagram HC) |
1838264 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1943 | Sheds noted 1/43 | 2870 ABDR; 8710, 9797 ABG; 3821, 4909, 6835/9, 7800/11 (BAN); 2220, 5025/76, 5564, 6014/7/24, 7802 (BL); 6863 BL/SPM; 4094, 5049, 5970, 6353 (CDF); 5951, 7815 (GLO); 3446, 5060, 6000, 6911 (LA); 6857 (LDR); 5028 (NA); 2636 (NPT); 9317 (OXF); 8302 (OXY); 2881, 4037/89, 4900/98, 5027, 5922/41/96(); 6155, 6902/20, 9306/8 (PDN); 5975 (PPR); 9315 (RDG); 4956, 5566, 6387, 7253 (SDN); 5994 (SLP); 2838/62, 6873 (STJ); 4013/53, 5031, 5957, 6321 (SRD); 5346 (TYS); 5954/99 (TN); 4045, 5406 (WES); 5983, 6877, 6921 (WOS). | SLS/194302 |
30/11/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during Nov. included: Nos. 905, 1001, 1010, 1413, 1450, 1713, 1799, 2327, 2722, 2781, 2838, 2864, 2868, 2927, 2941, 2979, 3186, 3383, 3817, 3834, 3852, 4039, 4056, 4058, 4073, 4088, 4089, 4919, 4925, 4969, 4979, 4995, 5008, 5042, 5070, 5078, 5336, 5355, 6115, 6136, 7311, W.D. 77291, 77393, 77508, 79278. Of these, 77291/393 and 79238 are ex Marston Sidings and repair in Belgium, and 77508/79278 are fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots during November have included Nos. 242, 905, 1713 an 2781. 'Star' Class No. 4054 EXE was ex Works on 8/11, having been lined out. W.D. No. 78542 GLO was ex Works on 12/11. This is another loco. fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Locos. which have been condemned during November are: Nos. 200, 207, 898, 2783 an 3007. | SLS/194801 |
30/04/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1422/53, 2053, 2230/33, 2414, 2805/10/25, 2915/30/34/35, 3421, 3610, 3709, 3824/48/58, 4017/19/50/89/92/99, 4248/57, 4500/24/50/74/75, 4706, 4906/09/37/63/64, 5037,91/95, 5314, 5900/06124/30/41/60/64/81, 6009/21/26, 6119/24/34/51/62/68, 6313/56/72/98, 6806/63, 6918, 7003, 7321, W.D. 77000, 78607, 79283/288. W.D. No. 77060/145/280/335, 78624 an 79244 have had their tenders removed and were taken to the stock shed on 25/3, where they are now stored. Works' pilots have been: Nos. 198, 1713/53, 2781 an 15102 PDN. New Work 30/4: 15102 PDN (being run in as Works' pilot); 6990; 9662 NPT, 9663 TN, 9664 NPT, 9665, 9666 NEA; 7008 being nearly complete. Engines condemned during April included: Nos. 302 an 3408 | SLS/194806 |
31/05/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. 1903, 2031, 2808/89, 2924/36/37/54, 3827, 4021/22/32/51/80/89/91/96, 4386, 4938/40/92, 5010/21/23, 5158, 5258, 5317/36/74, 5526/48/59/65, 5914/68, 6001/11/25/29, 6369/89, 6426, 6807/71, 6900/06/27/29, 7007, 7301/15, 77028, 77429 an 78714. New work (May): Nos. 7008 OXF, 7009 LDR (the latter is fitted with smokebox number plate); D.E. 15103/04 PDN; 9667-70. No. 7010 is nearly ready (28/5) and is painted pea green, as also is No. 4089, which is undergoing a general repair. Nos. 6009/26 have been painted royal blue and lined out in grey, yellow and red. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 1713, 2730/49/81, 3561 and D.E. 15103/04. Locomotives condemned include: Nos. 3391, 2980 an 2988. | SLS/194807 |
17/09/1961 | Swindon Works ('A' Shop) | 'A' Shop: D604, D816/7/21/3/5/43/70, D3431, D6306/8/21, 2866, 3852, 4003/79/81/7/9, D1000-11, D2379-83, 4117, 4707, 4904/26/33/43/66/79/92/8, 5018/38/74/92, 5208, 5380, 6021/6, 6808/16/25/32/4/40, 6948, 7018/28, 7219, 7825, 7905/21, 13115/84/6, 13259/65, 92215/26. Works Sidings: D820, D2086, D2143/4, D2378, D7000, 1009, 3670, 3839/59, 4100, 4917/8/83, 5000/78, 5951/98, 6014/6/9/27, 6964/87/96, 7200, 7756/75, 7909, 8721, 9400, 9749, 73027, 78008, 92241/5. Triangle: 1640, 5087, 5198, 5516, 5934/75, 8762/72/87, 9751, 13355. Dump: 1361/6, 1433, 1604, 5318, 6720, 7745/98, 8429, 8740/74/7/89, 9735/6/67. 'C' Shop: 4203, 5110/95. Outside Stock Shed: D806, D4025, D6303, 4948, 5815, 6900. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: D801. Gasworks : Nil. | SLS/196111 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/07/1925 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4089, name: DONNINGTON CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g Diagram HA boiler fitted |
||
23/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1926. Dep: 27/04/1926. Work undertaken: Tender number 1785 (Churchward 3,500g) attached. |
||
16/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/02/1928. Dep: 15/06/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4613 (Diagram HA) |
||
15/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
05/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 05/06/1929. Dep: 17/09/1929. Work undertaken: Tender number 2436 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/09/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
05/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1931. Dep: 02/04/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4621 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2449 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/10/1931. Dep: 10/12/1931. | ||
26/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1932. Dep: 20/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4656 (Diagram HA) |
||
20/12/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
03/04/1933 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2410 | ||
24/11/1933 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2449 | ||
31/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1934. Dep: 28/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4610 (Diagram HA) |
||
30/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 30/04/1935. Dep: 11/08/1935. Work undertaken: Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (LDR) | ||
17/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/03/1936. Dep: 05/04/1936. | ||
05/04/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
30/04/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (LDR) | ||
09/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1936. Dep: 22/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4614 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2672 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
07/01/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
14/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1937. Dep: 17/02/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 2420 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/02/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (LDR) | ||
23/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 23/12/1937. Dep: 09/02/1938. Work undertaken: Tender number 2735 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
09/02/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swindon (SDN) | ||
13/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/01/1939. Dep: 01/02/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 2605 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/05/1939. Dep: 08/07/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 2681 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
09/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/07/1940. Dep: 24/08/1940. Work undertaken: Tender number 2626 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
07/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/07/1941. Dep: 18/09/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2534 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
06/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1942. Dep: ?/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4610 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2659 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/06/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 2851 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
07/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/03/1945. Dep: 19/04/1945. Work undertaken: Tender number 2575 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/09/1945. Dep: 22/10/1945. Work undertaken: Tender number 2717 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
06/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6687 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2577 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
08/1947 | Allocation | |||
30/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
10/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/12/1947. Dep: 23/12/1947. | ||
20/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 20/04/1948. Dep: 04/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6607 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2880 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
30/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (WEY) | ||
07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
10/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
08/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/09/1949. Dep: 17/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6636 (Diagram HB) |
||
09/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/10/1950. Dep: 15/11/1950. Work undertaken: Tender number 2645 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
06/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/06/1951. Dep: 20/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6610 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2873 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
20/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
19/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/11/1951. Dep: 18/01/1952. Work undertaken: Tender number 4108 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) | ||
26/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (83D) | ||
02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (83D) | ||
05/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 05/03/1953. Dep: 01/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6608 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2886 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
16/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/07/1953. Dep: 04/08/1953. Work undertaken: Tender number 2428 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
26/12/1953 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2733 | ||
06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
02/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/11/1954. Dep: 24/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6685 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4122 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 23/02/1956. Dep: 05/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6640 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2851 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 14/09/1957. Dep: 18/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7613 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2929 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
12/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 12/10/1959. Dep: 27/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6699 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4095 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
08/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/08/1961. Dep: 05/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6697 (Diagram HC) |
||
05/12/1961 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4074 | ||
14/07/1962 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4078 | ||
22/10/1962 | To Store | To Store at Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
08/1963 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2449 | ||
31/12/1963 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) | ||
07/09/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4089 from Reading (W.R.) (81D) | ||
01/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hayes: Bridgend |