Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 816 Today
» 1090 Yesterday
» 3131 Week
» 31089 Month
» 65731 Year
» 1287296 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4092   06/08/1925

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/08/1925 DUNRAVEN CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Tue 06/08/1925 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Tue 19/12/1961 off Oxford (81F)
Scrapping During 01/1962 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 36 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Churchward 3,500g 1866 08/1925 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 3,500g Intermediate 2376 05/01/1926 GWR 3,500g
Churchward 3,500g 2231 01/01/1927 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1866 10/1927 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1792 16/10/1928 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
4500 2397 22/05/1929 GWR
Collett 4,000g 2411 11/04/1930 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2406 17/04/1931 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2591 07/02/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2546 29/11/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2650 21/02/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2396 30/12/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2760 03/08/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2789 06/12/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2539 21/03/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4006 05/12/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2706 11/04/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2541 02/12/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2569 11/05/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 4017 18/08/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2449 15/12/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2432 15/12/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2908 01/04/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2416 23/01/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2845 12/09/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2744 28/05/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2835 06/05/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2430 08/03/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4125 16/07/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2743 03/12/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 06/08/1925
SRD Stafford Road 26/05/1926
PDN Old Oak Common 05/09/1926
CDF Cardiff Canton 28/04/1931
LA Laira 15/01/1934
WOS Worcester 21/02/1939
84A Stafford Road 07/11/1950
81D Reading (W.R.) 20/03/1958
81F Oxford 31/10/1960
   Withdrawn 19/12/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 05/11/1960
WDN   m/e 31/12/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/08/1925 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4652)
16/10/1928 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4619)
17/04/1931 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4634)
29/11/1934 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4613)
01/07/1937 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4610)
03/08/1942 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4604)
09/12/1946 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4640)
15/12/1948 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6640)
12/09/1950 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6609)
28/05/1952 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6618)
06/05/1954 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6671)
30/10/1956 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6604)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 31/12/1925 09/01/1926 10 days Light Repair
Tender number 2376 (Collett 3,500g Intermediate) attached.
 
Swindon Works 08/08/1927 09/11/1927 94 days Light Repair
Tender number 1866 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 21/10/1927 09/11/1927 20 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 20/08/1928 20/10/1928 62 days Heavy
Boiler number 4619 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 1792 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
174190
Swindon Works 25/04/1929 27/05/1929 33 days Light Repair
Tender number 2397 (4500) attached.
 
Swindon Works 24/06/1929 02/08/1929 40 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 06/02/1930 15/04/1930 69 days Heavy
Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
253313
Swindon Works 26/02/1931 28/04/1931 62 days General
Boiler number 4634 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2406 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
317021
Swindon Works 19/07/1932 21/09/1932 65 days Intermediate 409477
Swindon Works 06/11/1933 15/01/1934 71 days Intermediate 493543
Swindon Works 31/01/1934 10/02/1934 11 days Light Repair
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 01/10/1934 06/12/1934 67 days General
Boiler number 4613 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2546 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
543536
Swindon Works 07/01/1936 26/02/1936 51 days Intermediate
Tender number 2650 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
622468
Swindon Works 21/05/1937 09/07/1937 50 days General
Boiler number 4610 (Diagram HA)
708186
Swindon Works 03/01/1939 21/02/1939 50 days Intermediate 874469
Swindon Works 23/03/1939 15/04/1939 24 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 02/05/1939 23/05/1939 22 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 25/10/1940 15/01/1941 83 days Intermediate
Tender number 2396 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
911208
Swindon Works 04/06/1942 05/08/1942 63 days General
Boiler number 4604 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2760 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
979466
Swindon Works 04/08/1943 05/09/1943 33 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 13/10/1944 06/12/1944 55 days Intermediate
Tender number 2789 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1082563
Swindon Works 14/02/1946 21/03/1946 36 days Light Repair
Tender number 2539 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 23/10/1946 05/12/1946 44 days General
Tender number 4006 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 14/04/1947 18/04/1947 5 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 24/10/1947 02/12/1947 40 days Light Repair
Tender number 2541 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 20/04/1948 11/05/1948 22 days Light Repair
Tender number 2569 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 10/11/1948 15/12/1948 36 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6640 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1234211
Swindon Works 26/01/1950 01/03/1950 35 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 01/08/1950 07/11/1950 99 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6609 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2845 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1303278
Swindon Works 24/03/1952 28/05/1952 66 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6618 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2744 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1378090
Swindon Works 17/03/1954 06/05/1954 51 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6671 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2835 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1463202
Swindon Works 24/01/1955 08/03/1955 44 days Light Casual
Tender number 2430 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 03/05/1956 30/10/1956 181 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6604 (Diagram HB)
1549028
Swindon Works 01/04/1959 23/06/1959 84 days Heavy Intermediate 1641947
Swindon Works 09/10/1961   No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1925 Tender Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 1866    
06/08/1925 To Service To service as GWR Number 4092, name: DUNRAVEN CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HA boiler fitted
   
31/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/12/1925. Dep: 09/01/1926.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2376 (Collett 3,500g Intermediate) attached.
   
26/05/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD)    
05/09/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
01/01/1927 Tender Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 2231    
08/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/08/1927. Dep: 09/11/1927.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 1866 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
21/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/10/1927. Dep: 09/11/1927.    
20/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/08/1928. Dep: 20/10/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4619 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 1792 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
25/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/04/1929. Dep: 27/05/1929.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2397 (4500) attached.
   
24/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/06/1929. Dep: 02/08/1929.    
06/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/02/1930. Dep: 15/04/1930.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
26/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1931. Dep: 28/04/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4634 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2406 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
28/04/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
19/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 19/07/1932. Dep: 21/09/1932.    
06/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 06/11/1933. Dep: 15/01/1934.    
15/01/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
31/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/01/1934. Dep: 10/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1934. Dep: 06/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4613 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2546 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/01/1936. Dep: 26/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2650 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1937. Dep: 09/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4610 (Diagram HA)
   
03/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 03/01/1939. Dep: 21/02/1939.    
21/02/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (WOS)    
23/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/03/1939. Dep: 15/04/1939.    
02/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/05/1939. Dep: 23/05/1939.    
25/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 25/10/1940. Dep: 15/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2396 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1942. Dep: 05/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4604 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2760 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/08/1943. Dep: 05/09/1943.    
13/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 13/10/1944. Dep: 06/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2789 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
14/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/02/1946. Dep: 21/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2539 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1946. Dep: 05/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4006 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
09/12/1946 Modification Diagram HA number 4640 boiler fitted    
11/04/1947 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2706    
14/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/04/1947. Dep: 18/04/1947.    
24/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/10/1947. Dep: 02/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2541 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/04/1948. Dep: 11/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2569 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/08/1948 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 4017    
10/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 10/11/1948. Dep: 15/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6640 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/04/1949 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2908    
23/01/1950 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2416    
26/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/01/1950. Dep: 01/03/1950.    
01/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 01/08/1950. Dep: 07/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6609 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2845 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
24/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 24/03/1952. Dep: 28/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6618 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2744 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/03/1954. Dep: 06/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6671 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2835 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/01/1955. Dep: 08/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2430 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/07/1955 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4125    
03/12/1955 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2743    
03/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 03/05/1956. Dep: 30/10/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6604 (Diagram HB)
   
20/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
01/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/04/1959. Dep: 23/06/1959.    
31/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
09/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (No repairs) - Arr: 09/10/1961.    
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
19/12/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 4092 from Oxford (81F)    
01/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev