Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 397 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5366 Week
» 17879 Month
» 106071 Year
» 990452 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4093 19/05/1962

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 19/05/1962
Withdrawn 11/08/1968
Time in Service 6 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1969
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 19/05/1962
41B Sheffield Darnall w/e 02/05/1964
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
40B Immingham w/e 23/09/1967
   Withdrawn 11/08/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/03/1962 Sightings Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Test house. SLS 5/1962 Link
19/05/1962 To Service To service as D4093
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
23/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
11/08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D4093    
01/01/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev