Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4093   26/05/1926

Names Carried
Date From Name
26/05/1926 DUNSTER CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Mon 26/05/1926 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal During 09/1964 off St Philips Marsh (82B)
Scrapping During 01/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 38 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Churchward 3,500g 2223 26/05/1926 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2423 14/03/1929 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2592 29/10/1931 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2617 07/10/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2546 22/12/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2438 21/12/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2648 01/06/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2670 26/06/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2685 05/05/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2711 14/01/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2430 10/09/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2633 15/08/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2851 29/03/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2885 31/10/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2564 20/03/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2729 06/12/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2577 03/03/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2407 15/08/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2838 16/06/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2654 03/04/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2883 30/04/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2693 01/10/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4122 15/03/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2561 29/12/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2655 10/12/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2389 21/08/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4056 28/03/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4005 09/03/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Notes
Notes This loco also ran with Collett's 8 wheeled tender, number 2586, but this was not recorded on the engine card.

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 26/05/1926
TYS Tyseley 15/10/1932
PDN Old Oak Common 24/10/1932
CDF Cardiff Canton m/e 12/1933
NA Newton Abbot 02/03/1936
LA Laira 08/07/1937
PZ Penzance m/e 03/1938
LA Laira 13/05/1939
BRD Bristol Bath Road m/e 06/1943
85A Worcester 07/11/1950
87E Landore m/e 10/1952
87A Neath (Court Sart) 13/06/1961
87F Llanelly 11/02/1963
82B St Philips Marsh 04/03/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 01/11/1952
LOAN 87F Llanelly 4w/e 09/02/1963
EXLOAN 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 09/03/1963
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 2w/e 16/05/1964
WDN   07/09/1964
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
26/05/1926 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4621)
14/03/1929 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4655)
18/06/1930 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4631)
07/10/1932 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4606)
21/12/1934 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4605)
26/06/1937 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4632)
10/09/1942 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4609)
31/10/1945 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6653)
20/03/1947 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6630)
06/12/1948 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4657)
15/08/1950 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4617)
03/04/1952 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4605)
15/03/1956 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4652)
10/12/1957 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6688)
10/12/1957 Double Chimney fitted
28/03/1960 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7660)
09/03/1962 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7686)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 05/03/1928 25/05/1928 82 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 07/01/1929 18/03/1929 71 days Heavy
Boiler number 4655 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2423 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
170224
Swindon Works 28/04/1930 21/06/1930 55 days Heavy
Boiler number 4631 (Diagram HA)
259567
Swindon Works 22/08/1931 10/11/1931 81 days Intermediate
Tender number 2592 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
353533
Swindon Works 23/08/1932 15/10/1932 54 days General
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2617 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
416340
Swindon Works 31/10/1933 12/1933   Intermediate  
Swindon Works 30/04/1934 06/05/1934 7 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 31/10/1934 28/12/1934 59 days General
Boiler number 4605 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2438 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
560033
Swindon Works 08/01/1936 02/03/1936 55 days Intermediate 640845
Swindon Works 11/05/1937 08/07/1937 59 days General
Boiler number 4632 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2670 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
717251
Swindon Works 16/03/1939 13/05/1939 59 days Intermediate
Tender number 2685 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
808045
Swindon Works 07/11/1940 17/01/1941 72 days Intermediate
Tender number 2711 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
892022
Swindon Works 18/07/1942 13/09/1942 58 days General
Boiler number 4609 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2430 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
977891
Swindon Works 23/06/1944 15/08/1944 54 days Intermediate
Tender number 2633 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1059742
Swindon Works 27/02/1945 29/03/1945 31 days Light Repair
Tender number 2851 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 31/05/1945 02/07/1945 33 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 14/09/1945 31/10/1945 48 days General
Boiler number 6653 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2885 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1102731
Swindon Works 13/02/1947 20/03/1947 36 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6630 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2564 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1169634
Swindon Works 04/11/1948 06/12/1948 33 days General
Boiler number 4657 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2729 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1253470
Swindon Works 26/06/1950 15/08/1950 51 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4617 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2407 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1335217
Swindon Works 14/02/1952 03/04/1952 50 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4605 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2654 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1405464
Swindon Works 10/03/1954 30/04/1954 52 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2883 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1492355
Swindon Works 24/06/1954 07/07/1954 14 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 28/08/1954 01/10/1954 35 days Unclassified
Tender number 2693 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 27/01/1956 15/03/1956 49 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4652 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4122 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1561703
Swindon Works 16/03/1957 10/12/1957 270 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6688 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2655 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
1612888
Swindon Works 03/05/1958 20/05/1958 18 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 20/06/1958 21/08/1958 63 days Heavy Casual
Tender number 2389 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 29/01/1960 28/03/1960 60 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7660 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4056 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1705363
Swindon Works 29/12/1961 09/03/1962 71 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7686 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4005 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1788693

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/05/1926 To Service To service as GWR Number 4093, name: DUNSTER CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g
Diagram HA boiler fitted
   
05/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/03/1928. Dep: 25/05/1928.    
07/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/01/1929. Dep: 18/03/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4655 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2423 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
28/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/04/1930. Dep: 21/06/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4631 (Diagram HA)
   
22/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/08/1931. Dep: 10/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2592 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1932. Dep: 15/10/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2617 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/10/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS)    
24/10/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
31/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 31/10/1933. Dep: ?/12/1933.    
12/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
22/12/1933 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2546    
30/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/04/1934. Dep: 06/05/1934.    
31/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1934. Dep: 28/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4605 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2438 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/06/1935 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2648    
08/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/01/1936. Dep: 02/03/1936.    
02/03/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
11/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1937. Dep: 08/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4632 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2670 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/07/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
03/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (PZ)    
16/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 16/03/1939. Dep: 13/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2685 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/05/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
07/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/11/1940. Dep: 17/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2711 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1942. Dep: 13/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4609 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2430 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
23/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 23/06/1944. Dep: 15/08/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2633 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/02/1945. Dep: 29/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2851 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
31/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/05/1945. Dep: 02/07/1945.    
14/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1945. Dep: 31/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6653 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2885 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 13/02/1947. Dep: 20/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6630 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2564 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1948. Dep: 06/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4657 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2729 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/03/1950 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2577    
26/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 26/06/1950. Dep: 15/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4617 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2407 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
16/06/1951 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2838    
14/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 14/02/1952. Dep: 03/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4605 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2654 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
10/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/03/1954. Dep: 30/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2883 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1954. Dep: 07/07/1954.    
28/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/08/1954. Dep: 01/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2693 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/01/1956. Dep: 15/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4652 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4122 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
29/12/1956 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2561    
16/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 16/03/1957. Dep: 10/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6688 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2655 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
   
03/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/05/1958. Dep: 20/05/1958.    
20/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/06/1958. Dep: 21/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2389 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
29/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 29/01/1960. Dep: 28/03/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7660 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4056 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
13/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
29/12/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/12/1961. Dep: 09/03/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7686 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4005 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
04/03/1962 Sightings Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.   Link
11/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
04/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 4093 from St Philips Marsh (82B)    
01/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev