|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 15/10/1926 | 23/10/1926 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 02/02/1928 | 02/04/1928 | 61 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 14/01/1929 | 14/03/1929 | 60 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4652 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2419 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
161810 | |
Swindon Works | 14/01/1930 | 15/03/1930 | 61 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2541 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 06/02/1931 | 04/04/1931 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 4614 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2430 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
283913 | |
Swindon Works | 04/05/1932 | 07/07/1932 | 65 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2585 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
363377 | |
Swindon Works | 17/01/1933 | 02/1933 | General | ||||
Swindon Works | 05/04/1934 | 03/06/1934 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 4630 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2447 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
483271 | |
Swindon Works | 01/10/1935 | 18/11/1935 | 49 days | Intermediate | 585655 | ||
Swindon Works | 10/03/1936 | 09/04/1936 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 02/06/1936 | 05/06/1936 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 09/02/1937 | 03/04/1937 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 4629 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2418 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
674714 | |
Swindon Works | 21/03/1938 | 26/05/1938 | 67 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2671 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
762059 | |
Swindon Works | 04/09/1939 | 21/10/1939 | 48 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2800 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
862982 | |
Swindon Works | 30/04/1940 | 03/06/1940 | 35 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2620 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 18/04/1941 | 25/07/1941 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 4607 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2418 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
934219 | |
Swindon Works | 26/02/1943 | 14/04/1943 | 48 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2720 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1022332 | |
Swindon Works | 25/09/1944 | 15/11/1944 | 52 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6621 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2731 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1145088 | |
Swindon Works | 10/10/1945 | 23/11/1945 | 45 days | General | Tender number 2857 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 04/02/1947 | 08/03/1947 | 33 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 4653 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2761 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1211305 | |
Swindon Works | 24/05/1948 | 30/06/1948 | 38 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 07/02/1949 | 09/03/1949 | 31 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4615 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2577 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1304282 | |
Swindon Works | 17/10/1950 | 21/11/1950 | 36 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4641 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2841 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1391899 | |
Swindon Works | 16/10/1952 | 14/11/1952 | 30 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6622 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1494960 | |
Swindon Works | 03/08/1954 | 14/09/1954 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2931 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1576234 | |
Swindon Works | 23/04/1956 | 28/09/1956 | 159 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6611 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2806 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1653887 | |
Swindon Works | 07/02/1958 | 12/03/1958 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2861 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1743454 | |
Swindon Works | 07/10/1959 | 26/11/1959 | 51 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 4039 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1826064 | |
Swindon Works | 21/09/1961 | 17/11/1961 | 58 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6660 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2843 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1915543 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. 1903, 2031, 2808/89, 2924/36/37/54, 3827, 4021/22/32/51/80/89/91/96, 4386, 4938/40/92, 5010/21/23, 5158, 5258, 5317/36/74, 5526/48/59/65, 5914/68, 6001/11/25/29, 6369/89, 6426, 6807/71, 6900/06/27/29, 7007, 7301/15, 77028, 77429 an 78714. New work (May): Nos. 7008 OXF, 7009 LDR (the latter is fitted with smokebox number plate); D.E. 15103/04 PDN; 9667-70. No. 7010 is nearly ready (28/5) and is painted pea green, as also is No. 4089, which is undergoing a general repair. Nos. 6009/26 have been painted royal blue and lined out in grey, yellow and red. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 1713, 2730/49/81, 3561 and D.E. 15103/04. Locomotives condemned include: Nos. 3391, 2980 an 2988. | SLS/194807 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/06/1926 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4096, name: HIGHCLERE CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Laira (LA) Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g Diagram HA boiler fitted |
||
15/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/10/1926. Dep: 23/10/1926. | ||
02/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1928. Dep: 02/04/1928. | ||
02/04/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
14/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/01/1929. Dep: 14/03/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4652 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2419 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/10/1929 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2408 | ||
14/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1930. Dep: 15/03/1930. Work undertaken: Tender number 2541 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/03/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
06/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1931. Dep: 04/04/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4614 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2430 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/04/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
04/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 04/05/1932. Dep: 07/07/1932. Work undertaken: Tender number 2585 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1933. Dep: ?/02/1933. | ||
02/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
22/02/1933 | Modification | Diagram HA number 4618 boiler fitted | ||
22/02/1933 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2564 | ||
05/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1934. Dep: 03/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4630 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2447 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/06/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (LDR) | ||
01/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 01/10/1935. Dep: 18/11/1935. | ||
18/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
10/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/03/1936. Dep: 09/04/1936. | ||
02/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/06/1936. Dep: 05/06/1936. | ||
09/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1937. Dep: 03/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4629 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2418 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
21/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 21/03/1938. Dep: 26/05/1938. Work undertaken: Tender number 2671 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 04/09/1939. Dep: 21/10/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 2800 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
30/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/04/1940. Dep: 03/06/1940. Work undertaken: Tender number 2620 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/1941 | Allocation | |||
18/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1941. Dep: 25/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4607 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2418 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/07/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
10/10/1942 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2740 | ||
26/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 26/02/1943. Dep: 14/04/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 2720 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
16/09/1944 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2543 | ||
25/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 25/09/1944. Dep: 15/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6621 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2731 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1945. Dep: 23/11/1945. Work undertaken: Tender number 2857 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 04/02/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4653 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2761 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
24/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/05/1948. Dep: 30/06/1948. | ||
09/1948 | Allocation | |||
10/1948 | Allocation | |||
10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
07/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 07/02/1949. Dep: 09/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4615 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2577 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/02/1950 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2729 | ||
10/10/1950 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2589 | ||
17/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 17/10/1950. Dep: 21/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4641 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2841 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
16/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 16/10/1952. Dep: 14/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6622 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/08/1954. Dep: 14/09/1954. Work undertaken: Tender number 2931 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/10/1954 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2629 | ||
23/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 23/04/1956. Dep: 28/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6611 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2806 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
07/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/02/1958. Dep: 12/03/1958. Work undertaken: Tender number 2861 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
20/03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
07/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/10/1959. Dep: 26/11/1959. Work undertaken: Tender number 4039 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
21/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/09/1961. Dep: 17/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6660 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2843 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) | ||
17/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
01/01/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4096 from Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
10/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hayes: Bridgend |