Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 195 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5949 Week
» 33907 Month
» 68549 Year
» 1290114 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4097 08/09/1961
TOPS (Tops) 08883 05/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 08/09/1961
Withdrawn 28/02/2007
Time in Service 45 yrs, 5 mths , 20 dys
Cut Up 31/12/2007
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
63A Perth South (New) 08/09/1961
63B Fort William 4w/e 18/11/1961
63A Perth South 5w/e 01/06/1968
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 27/12/1969
ED Eastfield 4w/e 01/12/1973
ML Motherwell m/e 31/10/1979
   Withdrawn 28/02/2007


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
08/09/1961 To Service To service as D4097
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Perth South (63A)
   
18/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Fort William (63B)    
13/04/1968 Sightings Glasgow Works visit: On works at Glasgow RCTS 6/1968 Link
01/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Perth South (63A)    
27/08/1968 Sightings Perth depot: Around the area - Station pilot RO 12/1968 Link
27/12/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
01/12/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (ED)    
05/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08883    
31/10/1979 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (ML)    
28/02/2007 Withdrawn Condemned as 08883    
31/12/2007 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev