|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 03/03/1928 | 05/05/1928 | 64 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4611 (Diagram HA) Tender number 1509 (Dean 4,000g) attached. |
118858 | |
Swindon Works | 25/05/1929 | 02/08/1929 | 70 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4623 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2437 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
206577 | |
Swindon Works | 28/10/1930 | 23/12/1930 | 57 days | Heavy | Tender number 2438 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
292314 | |
Swindon Works | 14/10/1931 | 08/11/1931 | 26 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2537 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 13/01/1932 | 01/03/1932 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 4638 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2404 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
360919 | |
Swindon Works | 03/05/1932 | 16/05/1932 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 17/05/1933 | 07/1933 | Intermediate | ||||
Swindon Works | 22/05/1934 | 24/07/1934 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 4655 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2566 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
517198 | |
Swindon Works | 05/11/1935 | 06/01/1936 | 63 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2418 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
613665 | |
Swindon Works | 25/02/1937 | 12/04/1937 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2671 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
696261 | |
Swindon Works | 26/04/1938 | 07/07/1938 | 73 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
770832 | |
Swindon Works | 06/11/1939 | 31/12/1939 | 56 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2669 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
848626 | |
Swindon Works | 22/10/1941 | 21/12/1941 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 6618 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2675 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
937882 | |
Swindon Works | 24/08/1942 | 19/09/1942 | 27 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2869 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 12/04/1945 | 24/05/1945 | 43 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2401 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1066043 | |
Swindon Works | 12/09/1947 | 22/10/1947 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 6662 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2675 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1151250 | |
Swindon Works | 03/10/1949 | 17/11/1949 | 46 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4623 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2725 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1237850 | |
Swindon Works | 16/08/1951 | 02/10/1951 | 48 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4618 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2654 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1326826 | |
Swindon Works | 17/03/1952 | 29/04/1952 | 44 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2712 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 25/05/1953 | 13/08/1953 | 81 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2656 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1406982 | |
Swindon Works | 19/02/1955 | 06/04/1955 | 47 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7656 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2726 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1485647 | |
Swindon Works | 22/12/1955 | 14/02/1956 | 55 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2854 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 02/10/1956 | 05/12/1956 | 65 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 4039 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 16/04/1958 | 04/06/1958 | 50 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7657 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2649 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/06/1926 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4097, name: KENILWORTH CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g Diagram HA boiler fitted |
||
03/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/03/1928. Dep: 05/05/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4611 (Diagram HA) Tender number 1509 (Dean 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/05/1929. Dep: 02/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4623 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2437 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (WOS) | ||
11/09/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carmarthen (CARM) | ||
28/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/10/1930. Dep: 23/12/1930. Work undertaken: Tender number 2438 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/12/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
06/01/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
05/1931 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2426 | ||
14/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/10/1931. Dep: 08/11/1931. Work undertaken: Tender number 2537 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1932. Dep: 01/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4638 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2404 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/05/1932. Dep: 16/05/1932. | ||
17/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/05/1933. Dep: ?/07/1933. | ||
07/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
22/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1934. Dep: 24/07/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4655 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2566 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/07/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
05/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 05/11/1935. Dep: 06/01/1936. Work undertaken: Tender number 2418 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
06/01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
25/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1937. Dep: 12/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2671 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
26/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 26/04/1938. Dep: 07/07/1938. Work undertaken: Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Truro (TR) | ||
06/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 06/11/1939. Dep: 31/12/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 2669 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
31/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
22/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1941. Dep: 21/12/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6618 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2675 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/08/1942. Dep: 19/09/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2869 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 12/04/1945. Dep: 24/05/1945. Work undertaken: Tender number 2401 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/05/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
17/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Penzance (PZ) | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Penzance (PZ) | ||
12/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1947. Dep: 22/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6662 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2675 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exeter (EXE) | ||
30/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exeter (EXE) | ||
03/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 03/10/1949. Dep: 17/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4623 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2725 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (83D) | ||
25/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (83D) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
16/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 16/08/1951. Dep: 02/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4618 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2654 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
17/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1952. Dep: 29/04/1952. Work undertaken: Tender number 2712 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/05/1953. Dep: 13/08/1953. Work undertaken: Tender number 2656 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/01/1955 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2740 | ||
29/01/1955 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2798 | ||
19/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 19/02/1955. Dep: 06/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7656 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2726 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/12/1955. Dep: 14/02/1956. Work undertaken: Tender number 2854 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/10/1956. Dep: 05/12/1956. Work undertaken: Tender number 4039 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (87E) | ||
16/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 16/04/1958. Dep: 04/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7657 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2649 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
||
04/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swindon (82C) | ||
06/05/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4097 from Swindon (82C) | ||
06/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |