Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 591 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6568 Week
» 22766 Month
» 187666 Year
» 698768 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4099 19/09/1961
TOPS (Tops) 09011 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 09
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service 19/09/1961
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 19/09/1961
73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon 4w/e 05/03/1962
73C Hither Green m/e 09/12/1963
73F Ashford Chart Leacon w/e 30/09/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/09/1961 To Service To service as D4099
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
05/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
09/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
30/09/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
11/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 09011    

prev prev