Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 552 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 13958 Week
» 66974 Month
» 186501 Year
» 3213354 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D41 |
29/07/1961 |
|
TOPS (45/1) |
45147 |
11/01/1975 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
29/07/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
04/01/1985 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys |
Cut Up |
03/1985 |
Cut At |
Vic Berry (at Patricroft) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/12/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1975 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/07/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/12/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
01/1975 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
10/07/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Passenger working |
|
01/08/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D41 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
10/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
08/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
01/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
01/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45147 |
|
|
04/01/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45147 |
|
|
03/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: at Patricroft |
|
|