Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1465 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19268 Week
» 72284 Month
» 191811 Year
» 3218664 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4100 |
26/09/1961 |
|
TOPS (09/0) |
09012 |
01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/12/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/09/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4100 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
07/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
09/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/12/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
22/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selhurst (75C) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 09012 |
|
|