Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 1026 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18829 Week
» 71845 Month
» 191372 Year
» 3218225 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4101 |
03/10/1961 |
|
TOPS (09/0) |
09013 |
02/1974 |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/10/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4101 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
09/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
29/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 09013 |
|
|
29/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|