Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 590 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6567 Week
» 22765 Month
» 187665 Year
» 698767 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4102 12/10/1961
TOPS (Tops) 09014 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 09
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service 12/10/1961
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
75C Norwood Junction (New) 12/10/1961
73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon 5w/e 02/07/1962
70B Feltham 4w/e 09/07/1967
75C Selhurst 9w/e 22/07/1970


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/10/1961 To Service To service as D4102
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C)
   
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
09/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
11/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
22/07/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Selhurst (75C)    
09/01/1972 Sightings Swindon Works visit: In "A" shop RO 3/1972 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 09014    

prev prev