Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1628 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15034 Week
» 68050 Month
» 187577 Year
» 3214430 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4103 |
26/10/1961 |
|
TOPS (09/0) |
09015 |
01/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/07/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
08/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/10/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4103 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
30/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
08/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
09/07/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
22/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selhurst (75C) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 09015 |
|
|