Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 165 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1031 Week
» 25693 Month
» 284552 Year
» 795654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4105 07/11/1961
TOPS (Tops) 09017 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 09
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service 07/11/1961
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
6A Chester (MR) (New) 07/11/1961
70B Feltham 2w/e 23/09/1968
75C Selhurst 9w/e 22/07/1970


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
07/11/1961 To Service To service as D4105
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)
   
08/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
23/09/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
22/07/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Selhurst (75C)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 09017    

prev prev