Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3424 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16830 Week
» 69846 Month
» 189373 Year
» 3216226 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4109 |
29/11/1961 |
|
TOPS (09/0) |
09021 |
01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 03/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/11/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4109 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
07/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Southern Region (SR) |
|
|
09/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selhurst (75C) |
|
|
12/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 09021 |
|
|
31/12/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 09021 |
|
|
07/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|