Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 763 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6368 Week
» 17915 Month
» 417597 Year
» 494184 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4110   10/1936

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 10/1936
Withdrawal During 06/1965
Service Life 28 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84H Wellington 4w/e 29/12/1956
84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 03/10/1959
84E Tyseley 4w/e 07/10/1961
83B Taunton 4w/e 14/07/1962
83B Taunton 4w/e 15/12/1962
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 01/06/1963
88B Radyr w/e 08/11/1964
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 5w/e 16/05/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TYS Tyseley 4w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC TYS Tyseley 4w/e 18/06/1949
ALLOC TYS Tyseley 4w/e 16/07/1949
ALLOC 84H Wellington 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 07/10/1961
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 14/07/1962
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 88B Radyr 3w/e 02/11/1964
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 5w/e 16/05/1965
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1936 To Service To service as GWR Number 4110
Built at Swindon Works
   
29/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wellington (84H)    
03/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
01/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
16/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 4110    

prev prev