Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 777 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 4394 Week
» 16099 Month
» 347588 Year
» 424175 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4113 04/01/1962
TOPS (Tops) 09025 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 09
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service 04/01/1962
Withdrawn 31/08/2005
Time in Service 43 yrs, 7 mths , 27 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
9A Longsight (New) 04/01/1962
8J Allerton w/e 21/09/1968
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 13/07/1974
EH Eastleigh m/e 31/01/1976
91S To Southern Region w/e 21/02/1976
BM Bournemouth m/e 31/10/1976
   Withdrawn 31/08/2005

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/11/1961 Sightings Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop - under construction - body shell. SLS 1/1962 Link
09/12/1961 Sightings Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop - under construction - engines in. SLS 1/1962 Link
04/01/1962 To Service To service as D4113
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Longsight (9A)
   
21/09/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Allerton (8J)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 09025    
13/07/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
31/01/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (EH)    
21/02/1976 Allocation Reallocated to To Southern Region (91S)    
31/10/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM)    
31/08/2005 Withdrawn Condemned as 09025    

prev prev