Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 92 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3709 Week
» 15414 Month
» 346903 Year
» 423490 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4115 18/01/1962
TOPS (Tops) 08885 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service 18/01/1962
Withdrawn 07/05/1993 off Doncaster (DR)
Time in Service 31 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
24C Lostock Hall (New) 18/01/1962
8J Allerton w/e 21/09/1968
   Withdrawn 07/05/1993

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
09/12/1961 Sightings Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop - under construction - frames. SLS 1/1962 Link
18/01/1962 To Service To service as D4115
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Lostock Hall (24C)
   
21/09/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Allerton (8J)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08885    
07/05/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 08885 from Doncaster (DR)    

prev prev