Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1818 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19621 Week
» 72637 Month
» 192164 Year
» 3219017 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4119 |
22/02/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08889 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
25/03/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/02/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
25/03/1975 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/02/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4119 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
13/01/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08889 |
|
|
25/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shirebrook (SB) |
|
|
25/03/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CA) |
|
|
06/03/1992 |
Withdrawn |
|
|
|
29/03/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|