Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 15 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6861 Week
» 18408 Month
» 418090 Year
» 494677 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4121   12/1937

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 12/1937
Withdrawal During 06/1965
Service Life 27 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PPRD Pontypool Road 4w/e 03/12/1949
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 21/02/1953
86F Tondu 4w/e 09/08/1958
88J Aberdare 3w/e 04/05/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SRD Stafford Road 4w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC PPRD Pontypool Road 4w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 86F Tondu 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 88J Aberdare 3w/e 04/05/1964
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 3w/e 29/06/1964
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1937 To Service To service as GWR Number 4121
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (PPRD)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tondu (86F)    
04/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (88J)    
06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 4121    

prev prev