Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2218 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20021 Week
» 73037 Month
» 192564 Year
» 3219417 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4125 |
05/04/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08895 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/04/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
08/1969 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/04/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4125 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
19/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
07/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
08/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
27/09/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
13/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
20/01/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08895 |
|
|
10/09/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08895 from Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
07/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Raxstar: at Margam MPD |
|
|