Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 770 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4630 Week
» 7212 Month
» 271845 Year
» 1493410 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4125 m/e 05/1938

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 313
To Service During 05/1938
Withdrawal During 06/1965
Scrapping During 11/1965
Service Life 27 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1938
84E Tyseley 8w/e 20/04/1957
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 02/11/1957
81F Oxford 4w/e 30/11/1957
84E Tyseley 4w/e 12/06/1958
81F Oxford 4w/e 09/08/1958
84D Leamington 4w/e 20/05/1961
84E Tyseley 4w/e 12/08/1961
84D Leamington 4w/e 27/01/1962
2A Tyseley w/e 06/03/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 23/03/1957
LOAN 84E Tyseley m/e 30/04/1957
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 12/08/1961
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 5w/e 12/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1946 Swindon Works Locos entering works during January: 207/42/70, 1751/86, 2084, 2116, 2221/74, 2679, 2766, 2802/11/53/62/98, 2912/51, 3034, 3188, 3219/64, 3754, 3808/63, 4004/13/7/21, 4125, 4299, 4326, 4539/47/98, 4615, 4811/5/54, 4909/51/6/63/90, 5019/46/55/6/80, 5161, 5361, 5403, 5534/40/52/65, 5906/25/51/72/4/85, 6003/10/4/9/22/6, 6112, 6314/45/7/56, 6690, 6721, 6919/61/5, 7300/9, 7700/8, 7804, 8359, 8704/14/22/70, 9301, 9768/89/91, WD 71488, 75046. SLS/194604
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1938 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4125
Built at Swindon Works
   
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
02/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
20/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
12/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
27/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
06/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 4125    

prev prev