Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 696 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14102 Week
» 67118 Month
» 186645 Year
» 3213498 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4130 |
14/05/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08900 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
15/11/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/05/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
15/11/1969 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/05/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4130 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Exeter (83C) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
31/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
15/11/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08900 |
|
|
30/09/2008 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08900 |
|
|
02/2009 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|