Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 855 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4715 Week
» 7297 Month
» 271930 Year
» 1493495 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4133 m/e 10/1939

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 5101
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 323
To Service During 10/1939
Withdrawal During 10/1964
Scrapping During 01/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 25 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1939
LA Laira 8w/e 23/03/1946
NA Newton Abbot 4w/e 20/04/1946
83D Laira 3w/e 19/05/1951
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 31/08/1951
82D Westbury 4w/e 31/10/1953
83C Exeter 8w/e 26/03/1955
82D Westbury 4w/e 23/04/1955
82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 16/07/1955
84E Tyseley 05/11/1961
84D Leamington 4w/e 03/11/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LA Laira 4w/e 23/03/1946
ALLOC NA Newton Abbot 4w/e 20/04/1946
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 21/04/1951
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 09/11/1961
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 30/11/1961
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 02/12/1961
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 03/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1949 Swindon Works New Work July: Nos. 1501 (1/7), 1502 (27/7). Both are unlined black. Locomotives entering Works during July included: Nos. 1005/12/25, 1467/68, 2206, 2856/86, 2920, 3663, 3779, 3853, 4013/41/56/61, 4133, 4381, 4631, 4901/43, 5050/69, 5238, 5369, 5552/59, 5918, 6003, 6103/08/22, 6320 (for re-conversion), 6336/45/54, 6417, 6804/38, 6910, 7307, 7809, 7905, 8762. Condemned: 2708 an 9087. No. 3837 (ex 4854) has been re-converted to coal-burning. No. 6020 has been painted blue, while No. 4961 has been Painted black and fully lined. The first of the contractor built series of 94XX arrived on Works on 27/7 viz: Nos. 8400 an 8401; they have entered shops to have the A.T.C. gear fitted. Works' Nos. checked are: Bagnall 2910/11 of 1949.
Awaiting Works at the east end of the yard- were Nos. 1000, 2708, 2875, 3635, 4981, 5057, 5554/57, 6844; No. 2863 (ex 4805-oil-burning) was also in evidence. B shop contained Nos. 1363, 1467/68, 2206/11, 2572, 3663/77, 4631, 6408/09/17, 7735, 9638. New engines from Bagnall's were Nos. 8400/1 (makers Nos. 2910/1) and Swindon construction included Nos. 7026 (painted), 7027, 1504 (painted), 1505 and the frames of a diesel (Lot 363). Barry 0-6-2T's Nos. 212, 213 an 246 were acting as Works' shunters.
SLS/194909
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1939 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4133
Built at Swindon Works
   
23/03/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
20/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
31/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 4133    

prev prev