Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4039 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17445 Week
» 70461 Month
» 189988 Year
» 3216841 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4139 |
11/07/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08909 |
09/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 11/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/07/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/07/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4139 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
10/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) |
|
|
31/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
12/12/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
20/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08909 |
|
|