Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 818 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18621 Week
» 71637 Month
» 191164 Year
» 3218017 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D414 |
24/04/1968 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50014 |
04/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Warspite |
30/05/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1969 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1970 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/04/1968 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
11/1969 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS, Multiple Working fitted |
|
|
03/1970 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS, Multiple Working fitted |
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
09/03/1985 |
|
Oxford Station |
Worked a Paddington to Oxford service |
|
David Staples, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/04/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D414 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
11/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50014 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
30/05/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Warspite' at Laira |
|
|
13/12/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50014 |
|
|
07/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|