Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 14 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6860 Week
» 18407 Month
» 418089 Year
» 494676 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4143 23/08/1962
TOPS (Tops) 08913 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service 23/08/1962
Withdrawn 01/11/2005
Time in Service 43 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
5B Crewe South (New) 23/08/1962
5A Crewe Diesel w/e 25/11/1967
   Withdrawn 01/11/2005

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
23/08/1962 To Service To service as D4143
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Crewe South (5B)
   
25/11/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A)    
26/07/1969 Sightings Allerton shed: Open Day RO 9/1969 Link
27/12/1971 Sightings Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot RO 517 Link
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08913    
01/11/2005 Withdrawn Condemned as 08913    

prev prev